Global Patent Index - EP 0995692 A3

EP 0995692 A3 2000-11-15 - Envelope

Title (en)

Envelope

Title (de)

Briefumschlag

Title (fr)

Enveloppe

Publication

EP 0995692 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99203159 A

Priority

NL 1010187 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0995692A2] The invention concerns an envelope and a broadsheet for it, whereby the envelope is suited to be used a second time and for that purpose contains a second seal flap (12). The second seal flap (12) can be part of the front panel (1) of the envelope. The envelope can consequently be torn in two along a tear-off perforation (5, 5') and may contain two address windows (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 27/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 27/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 27/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995692 A2 20000426; EP 0995692 A3 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020307

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010507

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI