Global Patent Index - EP 0995693 A1

EP 0995693 A1 2000-04-26 - Process for producing a container having a resealable closure and container made by this process

Title (en)

Process for producing a container having a resealable closure and container made by this process

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Behälters mit wiederverschliessbarem Verschluss, sowie damit hergestellter Behälter

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un récipient à couvercle refermable et récipient ainsi obtenu

Publication

EP 0995693 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99307774 A

Priority

  • CA 2315601 A
  • US 17827498 A

Abstract (en)

A container having a resealable closure and a process of producing such container includes the following. A hollow container (10) of desired shape and having an open upper (11) end of desired dimension is provided. An overcap substrate (13) is provided. A heat sealable membrane disc (12) of desired shape and dimensions to cover the open upper end of the hollow container is provided. The membrane disc is laminated to the overcap substrate with a material which releases the membrane disc from the overcap substrate under the application of heat. An overcap is then fabricated of desired shape and dimensions to fit over the open upper end of the hollow container from the substrate with the membrane disc on the inside thereof. The overcap is positioned over the open upper end of the hollow container so that the membrane disc is in contact with and covers the open upper end of the container. Heat is applied to the overcap to effect heat sealing of the membrane disc to the upper end of the container to hermetically seal such container end and to effect release of the membrane disc from the overcap. Preferably, the container is constructed of a composite material including a paperboard body portion (15) and a heat sealable liner (17) and has an outwardly beaded open upper end. Preferably, the overcap is formed of paperboard material. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 51/20; B65B 7/28; B65D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/228 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0018 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0093 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00092 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00268 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00527 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00638 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00685 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00731 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00796 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 3892351 A 19750701 - JOHNSON CHARLES LOUIS, et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995693 A1 20000426; EP 0995693 B1 20030514; CA 2315601 A1 20020204; CA 2315601 C 20050308; DE 69907847 D1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69907847

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121001

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111103

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110928

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69907847

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONOCO DEVELOPMENT, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI