Global Patent Index - EP 0995694 A1

EP 0995694 A1 2000-04-26 - Display support for a toy weapon, especially for a toy pistol

Title (en)

Display support for a toy weapon, especially for a toy pistol

Title (de)

Ausstellungsträger für eine Spielzeugwaffe, besonders für eine Pistole

Title (fr)

Support de présentation pour une arme d'enfant, en particulier pour un pistolet

Publication

EP 0995694 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830614 A

Priority

IT FI980107 U

Abstract (en)

The support comprises a small panel (1) that can be hung up and has two bracket-shaped hooks (5, 5) on which the article (P) to be displayed can be placed; a tie (7) fastens the article to the panel so that it cannot be removed therefrom; the tie passes through two holes (9; 10) formed in the panel (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 73/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 73/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 73/0014 (2013.01); B65D 73/0064 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995694 A1 20000426; IT 244672 Y1 20020312; IT FI980107 U1 20000421

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020119

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI