Global Patent Index - EP 0995695 A1

EP 0995695 A1 2000-04-26 - Pouch or packaging for foodstuffs made of a peelable film and process for the production thereof

Title (en)

Pouch or packaging for foodstuffs made of a peelable film and process for the production thereof

Title (de)

Beutel für Nahrungsmittel aus abziehbaren Folien und Verfahren zur Hestellung

Title (fr)

Sachet pour nourriture formé à partir d'un film pelable et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0995695 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99113038 A

Priority

IT VR980092 A

Abstract (en)

An airtight pouch or packaging (10, 20) made of synthetic material for the preservation of food products (12) is obtained by sealing (13, 14, 15) and cutting said synthetic material by an automatic packaging machine with a horizontal or vertical motioning of the product. The packaging (10, 20) is constituted by a single peelable type film (11) consisting of an oriented polyamide layer coupled with a coextruded peelable polyethylene layer, said film being folded once on the polyethylene layer side in order to form the inner part of said packaging. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/20; B65B 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995695 A1 20000426; EP 0995695 B1 20020612; AT 219013 T 20020615; DE 69901771 D1 20020718; DE 69901771 T2 20030109; DK 0995695 T3 20020729; ES 2175880 T3 20021116; IT 1304213 B1 20010313; IT VR980092 A1 20000426

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020612

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100707

2012-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100707

2011-08-22 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100706

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100706

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PFM S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20100731

2010-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: P.F.M. S.P.A.

- Free text: P.F.M. S.P.A.#VIA PASUBIO, 49#36036 TORREBELVICINO (VICENZA) (IT) -TRANSFER TO- P.F.M. S.P.A.#VIA PASUBIO, 49#36036 TORREBELVICINO (VICENZA) (IT)

2010-04-01 [NLV5] NL: ANNULMENT (ART. 75)

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090714

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090625

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090714

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-02-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175880 T3

2002-09-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-07-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901771 20020718

2002-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2002-07-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020706

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-06-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219013 T 20020615

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI