Global Patent Index - EP 0995696 A1

EP 0995696 A1 2000-04-26 - Pallet container for the transport and storage of liquids

Title (en)

Pallet container for the transport and storage of liquids

Title (de)

Palettenbehälter für den Transport und die Lagerung von Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Récipient-palette pour le transport et le stockage de liquides

Publication

EP 0995696 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117788 A

Priority

DE 29818828 U

Abstract (en)

The pallet container is for transporting and storing liquids or fine powders. The pallet (2) has the container (3) put on it along with a wire grid shell (6). The container has a drain cock (7) near the bottom. Stop elements (8) are fitted to the pallet, at least in the region of the drain cock, against which the container rests when the pallet is angled in the direction of the drain cock. There may be one stop element either side of the drain cock, at a set spacing (B) from it.

Abstract (de)

Es handelt sich um einen Palettenbehälter (1) für den Transport und die Lagerung von Flüssigkeiten, mit einer Palette (2), einem auf die Palette aufgesetzten Behälter (3) mit Behälterboden (4) und einem Drahtgitter-Außenmantel (6), wobei der Behälter im Bereich des Behälterbodens zum Zwecke der Entleerung einen Ablaufhahn (7) aufweist. Auf der Palette sind zumindest im Bereich des Ablaufhahns Anschlagelemente (8) angeordnet, gegen welche der Behälter bei in Richtung des Ablaufhahns geneigter Palette anliegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/10 (2006.01); B65D 19/44 (2006.01); B65D 77/04 (2006.01); B65D 77/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/44 (2013.01); B65D 19/10 (2013.01); B65D 77/0466 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00024 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00029 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00034 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00059 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00064 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00069 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00164 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00522 (2013.01); B65D 2519/008 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00815 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29818828 U1 19990128; EP 0995696 A1 20000426; EP 0995696 B1 20031126

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907850

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907850

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130910

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090909

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090909

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090909

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040118

2004-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907850 P 20040108

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI