Global Patent Index - EP 0995706 A1

EP 0995706 A1 2000-04-26 - Bobbin changer

Title (en)

Bobbin changer

Title (de)

Bobinenwechsler

Title (fr)

Changeur de bobines

Publication

EP 0995706 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117345 A

Priority

DE 19847160 A

Abstract (en)

A textile processing machine has a bobbin-exchange unit which has a holding point (20) for one or more bobbins (18). A mechanical handling device transfers a waiting bobbin to the textile machine on demand and places it on the bobbin tray. The mechanical handling device (30) is an elevating platform which transfers the replacement bobbin especially directly to the tray (2).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Bobinenwechsler für eine Bobinenverarbeitungsmaschine (6), mit einer Vorhaltestation (20) zur Zwischenlagerung mindestens einer Bobine (18), mit einem Fördermittel (30) zum Bewegen mindestens einer Bobine in der Vorhaltestation, und mit einem Bobinenteller mit mindestens einer Bobinenaufnahme (10a). Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß das Fördermittel die Bobinen direkt von der Vorhaltestation (20) an den Bobinenteller übergibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/30 (2006.01); B65H 19/12 (2006.01); B65H 67/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/123 (2013.01); B65H 2301/413223 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4172 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4185 (2013.01); B65H 2301/418523 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4187 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19847160 A1 20000420; CN 1159197 C 20040728; CN 1250741 A 20000419; EP 0995706 A1 20000426; EP 0995706 B1 20040506; JP 2000118811 A 20000425; PL 335828 A1 20000425; US 6402083 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050903

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050903

2005-09-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050903

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-04-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-10-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041013

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040831

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040825

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040817

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909390 P 20040609

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2004-05-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020723

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI