Global Patent Index - EP 0995707 A2

EP 0995707 A2 2000-04-26 - Winding machine

Title (en)

Winding machine

Title (de)

Wickelmaschine

Title (fr)

Enrouleuse

Publication

EP 0995707 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118126 A

Priority

DE 19848816 A

Abstract (en)

The winding machine includes a support drum (12) with suction, and a winding gap (18) formed between the support drum and cylinder drum (16). The support drum which has a perforated sleeve and/or circumferential grooves has suction applied from outside on the circumferential area which is not looped by the perforated support belt (40) and material web (14). The guide end for subsequent guidance onto the cylinder roller (16) from the inlet roller (24) to the outlet roller (42) is both supported by the support belt (40) and also fixed by vacuum inside of the support belt. The support belt loops round the inlet roller in the transition area.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Wickelmaschine 10 zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn 14 wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn auf einen Tambour 16 wird die über eine Einlaufwalze 24 zugeführte Materialbahn 14 zusammen mit einem perforierten Stützband 40 über eine besaugbare Tragtrommel 12 geführt und zwischen der Tragtrommel 12 und dem Tambour 16 ein Wickelspalt 18 gebildet. Im Anschluß an die Tragtrommel 12 ist das Stützband 40 über eine Auslaufwalze 42 geführt, die im Bereich eines Ausschußauflösers 22 angeordnet ist, in den ein Aufführende der Materialbahn 14 oder die gesamte Materialbahn 14 vor einem späteren Aufführen auf den Tambour 16 abgeführt wird. Die einen gelochten Mantel aufweisende und/oder mit Umfangsrillen versehene Tragtrommel 12 ist in ihrem nicht von dem perforierten Stützband 40 und der Materialbahn 14 umschlungenen Umfangsbereich von außen besaugt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/22 (2006.01); B65H 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/22 (2013.01); B65H 19/2261 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41414 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995707 A2 20000426; EP 0995707 A3 20021030; EP 0995707 B1 20041201; AT 283822 T 20041215; DE 19848816 A1 20000427; US 6311921 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090912

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090911

2010-05-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090911

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-02-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911182 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030502

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI