Global Patent Index - EP 0995709 A2

EP 0995709 A2 2000-04-26 - Sheet feeder for office machines and process for its manufacture

Title (en)

Sheet feeder for office machines and process for its manufacture

Title (de)

Blattzuführvorrichtung für Büromaschine und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation de feuilles pour machines de bureau et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0995709 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99101075 A

Priority

IT TO980895 A

Abstract (en)

In a sheet feeder for office machines, in which the advance in the desired direction of each of a plurality of sheets stacked in a magazine is caused by at least one rotating feed shaft and/or feed members integral with the shaft, according to the invention the friction surface of the feed shaft, or of the feed members integral with it, consists of a surface coating of rubberized enamel, applied as a paint and incorporating a particulate of a rubber resin, in such a way that the said surface coating imparts to the friction surface of the feed shaft, or of the feed members integral with it, a surface softness which increases with an increase in the thickness of the coating layer and a surface friction which makes it pleasant to touch ("soft touch") and suitable for feeding sheets, particularly sheets of paper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 27/00; B65H 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/06 (2006.01); B65H 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 27/00 (2013.01); B65H 3/0638 (2013.01); B65H 2401/115 (2013.01); B65H 2401/13 (2013.01); B65H 2402/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995709 A2 20000426; EP 0995709 A3 20010110; IT 1305129 B1 20010410; IT TO980895 A1 20000421

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 27/00 A

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI