Global Patent Index - EP 0995710 A2

EP 0995710 A2 2000-04-26 - Manual folding device for a sheet of paper

Title (en)

Manual folding device for a sheet of paper

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum manuellen Falten eines Papierbogens

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pliage manuel d'une feuille de papier

Publication

EP 0995710 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 99810875 A

Priority

CH 199998 A

Abstract (en)

The folder consists of a base with two prismatic projections (101,102) of different heights and a V-shaped recess (120) between them, used in conjunction with a clamp (200) into which the paper sheet is inserted. When the sheet is fully inside the clamp the latter is pressed down into the V-shaped recess to make a first fold, while a second fold is made along the upper edge (111) of the taller prism.

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif de pliage manuel notamment d'une feuille de papier (400) destinée à être insérée dans une enveloppe, comprend, d'une part, un premier élément sous forme de support (100) présentant sur une longueur une entaille à deux faces (103, 104) dont le profil est en forme de V, l'intersection de ces deux faces (103, 104) formant une arête (120), au moins l'une des faces (103, 104) se prolongeant par une surface contiguë (107; 108) de sorte à former avec cette dernière une arête (111; 112), et, d'autre part, un second élément sous forme de pince (200) présentant deux rabats (201, 202) dont le profil est en forme de V, ces rabats pouvant être appliqués l'un contre l'autre autour d'une arête (203) pour retenir la feuille de papier (400) après que celle-ci y ait été insérée. Les pliages résultent de l'action combinée des premier et second éléments, ces derniers étant par ailleurs autonomes l'un de l'autre. Un premier pliage procède de l'application des bords (211, 212) de la pince, ces bords venant pratiquement se confondre et pinçant ladite feuille, contre l'arête (120) du V du support. Un deuxième pliage peut résulter de l'action d'une arête (111; 112), la feuille étant rabattue autour de cette dernière. Selon une exécution préférée, le support (100) se présente sous la forme d'un double prisme (101, 102). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 45/12; B43M 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43M 3/02 (2006.01); B65H 45/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/12 (2013.01); B43M 3/02 (2013.01); B65H 2402/41 (2013.01); B65H 2407/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995710 A2 20000426; EP 0995710 A3 20020417

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031212

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021128

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020914

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 45/12 A, 7B 43M 3/02 B, 7B 43M 3/00 B

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI