Global Patent Index - EP 0995711 A3

EP 0995711 A3 2000-11-15 - Method for operating a working station in a winding machine

Title (en)

Method for operating a working station in a winding machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Arbeitsstelle einer Spulmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour actionner un poste de travail d' un bobinoir

Publication

EP 0995711 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110203 A

Priority

DE 19848881 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0995711A2] A winder fitted with an automatic splicer (40) uses the yarn tension after the repair of an end break to detect faulty supply bobbins which do not unwind properly. Excessive yarn tensions immediately initiate the changeover to the next supply bobbin (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 63/036; B65H 63/04; B65H 67/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 69/06 (2006.01); B65H 63/036 (2006.01); B65H 63/04 (2006.01); B65H 63/06 (2006.01); B65H 67/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 63/036 (2013.01); B65H 63/04 (2013.01); B65H 67/02 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995711 A2 20000426; EP 0995711 A3 20001115; EP 0995711 B1 20030903; DE 19848881 A1 20000427; JP 2000128436 A 20000509; JP 4643779 B2 20110302; TR 9902619 A2 20010723; TR 9902619 A3 20010723; US 6270033 B1 20010807

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2004-09-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-05-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040527

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906841 P 20031009

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2003-09-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAASEN, ROLF

2003-09-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEDERSHOVEN, HANS-GUENTER

2003-09-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THEELE, BERND-RUEDIGER

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 63/036 A, 7B 65H 67/02 B, 7B 65H 63/04 B

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI