Global Patent Index - EP 0995792 A1

EP 0995792 A1 2000-04-26 - Process of bleaching fabrics

Title (en)

Process of bleaching fabrics

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Gewebebleichung

Title (fr)

Procédé de blanchiment des tissus

Publication

EP 0995792 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98203513 A

Priority

EP 98203513 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a process of treating a fabric which comprises the steps of contacting said fabric with a bleaching composition wherein said bleaching composition comprises a peroxygen bleach and an ingredient reducing the evaporation of the solvent contained in said composition. Furthermore, the present invention relates to the use in a peroxygen bleach-containing composition of an ingredient reducing the evaporation of the solvent contained in said composition to treat fabrics, whereby colour fading and/or loss of tensile strength is reduced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/88 (2006.01); C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 3/43 (2006.01); C11D 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3765 (2013.01); C11D 1/66 (2013.01); C11D 1/88 (2013.01); C11D 1/94 (2013.01); C11D 3/3947 (2013.01); C11D 3/43 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995792 A1 20000426; AR 015324 A1 20010418; AU 6299099 A 20000508; JP 2002527609 A 20020827; MA 25518 A1 20021001; PE 12132000 A1 20001127; TR 200101098 T2 20011121; WO 0023554 A1 20000427

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-21 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070103

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041203

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000923

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI