Global Patent Index - EP 0995805 A1

EP 0995805 A1 2000-04-26 - Heat treatment installation for a batch of metallic workpieces

Title (en)

Heat treatment installation for a batch of metallic workpieces

Title (de)

Wärmebehandlungsanlage für eine Charge metallischer Werkstücke

Title (fr)

Installation pour le traitement thermique d'une charge de pièce métalliques

Publication

EP 0995805 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98811062 A

Priority

EP 98811062 A

Abstract (en)

Installation for thermal treatment of metallic parts comprises: a first assembly with at least one furnace, and a second assembly with at least one jig; one of the two assemblies is attached to a fixed structure (12) and the other assembly is connected to a moving structure (13) relatively to the fixed structure; couplings (16,17,18) are arranged between the two assemblies for placing one jig (6,7) facing one furnace while avoiding oxidation of the metallic part surface.

Abstract (fr)

L'installation pour le traitement thermique d'une charge de pièces métalliques comprend un premier ensemble avec au moins un four et un deuxième ensemble avec au moins un bac. Un des deux ensembles est fixé à une structure stationnaire et l'autre ensemble est attaché a une structure déplaçable par rapport à la structure stationnaire et des joints (16, 17, 18) sont disposés entre les deux ensembles pour mettre, au choix, un des bacs en regard de l'un des fours. Cette installation évite l'oxydation de la surface des pièces de la charge, la pollution et le refroidissement du four pendant et après le cycle de travail. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/00 (2006.01); F27D 99/00 (2010.01); F27B 9/16 (2006.01); F27B 17/00 (2006.01); F27D 3/00 (2006.01); F27D 7/06 (2006.01); F27D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 99/0073 (2013.01); C21D 9/00 (2013.01); C21D 9/0037 (2013.01); F27B 9/16 (2013.01); F27B 2017/0091 (2013.01); F27D 7/06 (2013.01); F27D 2003/0036 (2013.01); F27D 2003/0075 (2013.01); F27D 2009/0089 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995805 A1 20000426; EP 0995805 B1 20030528; EP 0995805 B9 20040128; AT 241705 T 20030615; DE 69815108 D1 20030703; DE 69815108 T2 20040205; ES 2199416 T3 20040216

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141024

2015-11-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151127

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141023

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69815108

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131029

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131022

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111023

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 241705 T

- Effective date: 20111023

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111023

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111023

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2199416 T3

2003-10-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815108 P 20030703

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI