Global Patent Index - EP 0995808 A1

EP 0995808 A1 2000-04-26 - COPPER ALLOY AND COPPER ALLOY THIN SHEET EXHIBITING IMPROVED WEAR OF BLANKING METAL MOLD

Title (en)

COPPER ALLOY AND COPPER ALLOY THIN SHEET EXHIBITING IMPROVED WEAR OF BLANKING METAL MOLD

Title (de)

KUPFER-LEGIERUNG UND DARAUS BESTEHENDES DÜNNES BLECH MIT VERBESSERTEM VERSCHLEISS FÜR EINE ROHUMFORM-KOKILLE

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE DE CUIVRE ET FEUILLE MINCE EN ALLIAGE DE CUIVRE POSSEDANT UNE RESISTANCE A L'USURE AMELIOREE EN TANT QUE MOULE METALLIQUE D'ESTAMPAGE

Publication

EP 0995808 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99939202 A

Priority

  • JP 9901116 W
  • JP 5798998 A
  • JP 15454598 A
  • JP 4432299 A

Abstract (en)

A copper-based alloy having excellent blanking die wear resistance, repeated bending fatigue resistance, and solderability as well as excellent resin adhesion, comprising 1.5 to 2.4 weight % of Fe, 0.008 to 0.08 weight % of P, 0.01 to 0.50 weight % of Zn, and 0.0005 to 0.02 weight % of C, and, if required, further containing 0.003 to 0.5 weight % of Ni and 0.003 to 0.5 weight % of Sn, and further containing a total amount of 0.0007 to 0.5 weight % of one or two or more elements selected from the group consisting of Al, Be, Ca, Cr, Mg and Si, and the balance being Cu and inevitable impurities, in which the total content of one or two or more elements selected from the group consisting of Nb, Ti, Zr, Ta, Hf, W, V and Mo is limited to less than 0.01 weight %.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 9/00; C22C 9/04; C22C 9/06; C22C 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 9/00 (2006.01); C22C 9/04 (2006.01); C22C 9/06 (2006.01); C22C 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995808 A1 20000426; EP 0995808 A4 20060412; EP 0995808 B1 20090826; CN 1102177 C 20030226; CN 1256715 A 20000614; DE 19980583 T1 20000413; HK 1028425 A1 20030523; KR 100562790 B1 20060321; KR 20010012450 A 20010215; TW 442576 B 20010623; WO 9946415 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120309

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110318

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100527

2009-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060926

2006-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060926

2006-04-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060224

2005-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 9/00 A

2005-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 9/04 B

2005-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 9/06 B

2005-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 9/10 B

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991106

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR IT