Global Patent Index - EP 0995819 A1

EP 0995819 A1 2000-04-26 - Apparatus for treating workpieces

Title (en)

Apparatus for treating workpieces

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Behandlung von Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Dispositif de traîtement d'objets

Publication

EP 0995819 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120189 A

Priority

  • EP 99120189 A
  • EP 98811039 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus for treating workpieces (2) consists of an anodizing unit in which workpieces are treated in a passage of large current.

Abstract (de)

Bei dieser Einrichtung zur Pulverbeschichtung (1) werden Werkstücke (2) beispielsweise Fahrtreppenstufen in einer Anodisiereinheit (7) einer Strombehandlung unterzogen. Ein Träger (3) fortbewegendes Fördermittel (4) ist über einem Becken (14) abgesenkt, sodass die Werkstücke (2) in Durchlaufrichtung (15) gesehen in ein Bad (16) eingetaucht werden und nach einer bestimmten Verweilzeit am Ende des Beckens (14) wieder aus dem Bad (16) gehoben werden. Im Beckenbereich ist eine parallel zur Fahrbahn des Fördermittels (4) verlaufende Stromzuführung (17) beispielsweise eine Stromschiene angeordnet. Jeder Träger (3) ist mit einem Stromabnehmer mit beispielsweise Schleif- oder Rollenkontakten versehen, die den Träger (3) mit der Stromzuführung (17) elektrisch verbinden. Die Verbindung wird beim Absenken des Trägers (3) hergestellt und beim Anheben des Trägers (3) unterbrochen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 17/06; B05C 3/10; B05C 9/10; B05C 9/12; C25D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 3/10 (2006.01); B05C 9/10 (2006.01); B05C 9/12 (2006.01); C25D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 17/06 (2013.01); B05C 3/10 (2013.01); B05C 9/10 (2013.01); B05C 9/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995819 A1 20000426; EP 0995819 B1 20031217

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2213324

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908091

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030113

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI