Global patent index - EP 0995827 A3

EP 0995827 A3 2000-09-06 - Method and device for treating tubular textile fabrics

Title (en)

Method and device for treating tubular textile fabrics

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von schlauchförmigen Textilwaren

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement des étoffes textiles tubulaires

Publication

EP 0995827 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99119309 A

Priority

DE 19847515 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0995827A2] Process to treat tubular textiles completely in one work process comprises determining distribution and position angle of products through product diameter. The distribution (2) and position angle (3) of the products are determined through the product diameter. On the basis of the angle, the aggregate rows (9,10; 13,14) of the planes (8,12) are arrangement symmetrically in themselves and asymmetrically in relation to each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995827 A2 20000426; EP 0995827 A3 20000906

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021031

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000926

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI