Global Patent Index - EP 0995828 A1

EP 0995828 A1 2000-04-26 - A washing cycle for washing machine

Title (en)

A washing cycle for washing machine

Title (de)

Waschgang für Waschmaschine

Title (fr)

Cycle de lavage pour machine à laver

Publication

EP 0995828 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830621 A

Priority

EP 98830621 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a novel bleaching washing cycle for wash-fast items, for washing machines. More particularly, the present invention relates to a washing cycle for wash-fast items for washing machines comprising: a bleaching stage, and at least one washing stage, characterized in that the bleaching stage is performed before the at least one washing stage. The bleaching stage is preferably performed with bleach. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 35/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] EP 0685587 A1 19951206 - MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA [IT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995828 A1 20000426; EP 0995828 B1 20050216; DE 69829052 D1 20050324; DE 69829052 T2 20060209; ES 2237833 T3 20050801

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-05 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20100102

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081020

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081020

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081019

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081019

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081019

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071010

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MIELE & CIE. KG SCHUTZRECHTE/VERTRAEGE

- Effective date: 20051115

2005-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237833 T3

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69829052 P 20050324

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-02-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020409

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991008

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI