Global Patent Index - EP 0995833 A2

EP 0995833 A2 2000-04-26 - Synthetic fibre rope

Title (en)

Synthetic fibre rope

Title (de)

Kunstfaserseil

Title (fr)

Câble en fibres synthétiques

Publication

EP 0995833 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120588 A

Priority

  • EP 99120588 A
  • EP 98811068 A

Abstract (en)

A synthetic fiber cable, including an intermediate sheath (13) having surfaces conforming with adjacent strand layers (8, 12), is new. A synthetic fiber cable consists of load-bearing synthetic fiber strands (2, 4, 7, 10) twisted together to form concentric inner and outer strand layers (5, 8, 12) separated by an intermediate sheath (13) which covers the inner strand layers (5, 8), the sheath (13) having surfaces matching the outer contour of the adjacent strand layers (8, 12). An Independent claim is also included for a lift system with the above cable.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Kunstfaserseil (1) aus in konzentrischen Litzenlagen (5,8,12) miteinander parallelverseilten tragenden Aramidfaserlitzen (4,7,10), wird vorgeschlagen, einen Zwischenmantel (13) mit an die Aussenkontur der angrenzenden Litzenlagen (8,12) angepassten Mantelflächen vorzusehen. Durch den festen Verband von inneren und äusseren Litzenlagen wird erfindungsgemäss eine höhere Torsionssteifigkeit des Litzenseils (1) erreicht. Ferner dient der elastische Zwischenmantel (13) zwischen den Litzenlagen (8,12) als Abriebschutz für die Litzen (4,7,10) und unterstützt eine grossflächige Drehmomentenübertragung im Seil (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D07B 1/16; D07B 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D07B 1/16 (2006.01); B66B 7/06 (2006.01); D07B 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D07B 1/162 (2013.01); B66B 7/06 (2013.01); D07B 1/025 (2013.01); D07B 1/165 (2013.01); D07B 1/167 (2013.01); D07B 2201/1036 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2072 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2074 (2013.01); D07B 2205/205 (2013.01); D07B 2501/2007 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

D07B 2205/205 + D07B 2801/10

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995833 A2 20000426; EP 0995833 A3 20000906; EP 0995833 B1 20030205; AR 020954 A1 20020605; AT 232252 T 20030215; AU 5601099 A 20000504; AU 752488 B2 20020919; BR 9905590 A 20000905; CA 2287070 A1 20000423; CA 2287070 C 20070410; CN 1190552 C 20050223; CN 1252469 A 20000510; CO 5021178 A1 20010327; CZ 297947 B6 20070502; CZ 9903766 A3 20000517; DE 59904213 D1 20030313; DK 0995833 T3 20030526; EG 22623 A 20030531; ES 2192011 T3 20030916; HK 1029148 A1 20030718; HU 227223 B1 20101129; HU 9903518 A2 20000528; HU 9903518 A3 20030728; HU 9903518 D0 19991228; IL 132300 A 20031031; IL 132300 D0 20010319; JP 2000192377 A 20000711; JP 4327959 B2 20090909; KR 100578782 B1 20060512; KR 20000029241 A 20000525; NO 314268 B1 20030224; NO 995171 A 20000425; NO 995171 D0 19991022; PE 11992000 A1 20001109; PL 195002 B1 20070731; PL 336032 A1 20000425; PT 995833 E 20030630; RU 2233925 C2 20040810; SG 76633 A1 20001121; SK 133299 A3 20000612; SK 286081 B6 20080305; TR 9902601 A2 20000522; TR 9902601 A3 20000522; TW 490529 B 20020611; US 6318504 B1 20011120; ZA 9906631 B 20000509

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161012

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121016

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130416

2013-08-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130508

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121016

2013-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121016

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121016

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121017

2013-07-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-06-18 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20030401154

- Effective date: 20130508

2013-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 232252 T

- Effective date: 20121016

2013-06-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2013-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INVENTIO A.G.

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-04-23 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130416

2012-06-29 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20111011

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20111024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20111020

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20111019

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20111013

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20111013

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111021

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20111011

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20101018

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192011 T3

2003-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-04-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030401154

2003-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904213 P 20030313

2003-03-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-02-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020423

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI