Global Patent Index - EP 0995834 A1

EP 0995834 A1 2000-04-26 - Method and device for improving the cross-machine shrinkage profile in a paper machine

Title (en)

Method and device for improving the cross-machine shrinkage profile in a paper machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verbesserung des Schrumpfungs-Querprofils in einer Papiermaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour améliorer le profil transversal du rétrécissement dans une machine à papier

Publication

EP 0995834 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112905 A

Priority

DE 19843729 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19843729A1] To maintain the lateral profile of a running paper or cardboard web, the lateral shrinkage profile is adjusted during the formation process. The variations are through alterations in the fiber suspension composition locally to affect sections across the web width, using different proportions of suspension components with different shrinkage behaviors. The shrinkage is increased at a section zone by a raised feed of fibers and/or other matter with a high shrinkage, or replacing fibers with fibers which shrink more strongly. The shrinkage is reduced by increasing the fiber feed of fibers with a low shrinkage character and/or other matter which shrinks less or replacing the fibers with the suspension containing fibers with lower shrinkage. The composition of the fiber suspension is adjusted at the stock inlet and/or the wet web section of the machine. Two flows of fiber suspension are prepared, to be mixed together at sections of the stock inlet to set the lateral shrinkage, while the lateral weight profile of the web is modified by the controlled flow of diluting water in sections across the web width. The fibers with a high shrinking tendency are long fibers and vice versa, very open fibers and vice versa, highly chopped or ground fibers and vice versa. The added matter to increase shrinkage is carboxymethyl cellulose (CMC) and/or other matter. The added matter to reduce shrinkage is a synthetic resin and/or wet strength agents and/or the like. The lateral weight profile of the web is measured, and the control values are determined to match the web weight in sections (N) across the web width together with a nominal profile for the operation of actuators (7). The shrinkage is computed by on-line mapping of the lateral weight profile, and the control values to set the shrinkage in sections (M) across the machine width using the nominal profile, and operate the actuators accordingly. The shrinkage with corrected values is measured, and the lateral shrinkage profile is computed by correlation between the measured values and the shrinkage. The control values are computed for sections (M) across the machine width, and the actuators are operated as appropriate. The on-line lateral weight mapping and the measurement of shrinkage with corrected values can be done together. The calculation for the lateral shrinkage profile is through correlation between the measured values and the shrinkage, and the weighted lateral shrinkage profile is registered from the measured and the computed lateral shrinkage profile to give the control values for the operation of the actuators. The profile control algorithm separates the lateral weight and shrinkage profiles. The measured values of the polish and/or strength are correlated with the shrinkage. An Independent claim is included for a paper or cardboard web prodn. machine with a constant section at the stock inlet with two zones for different fiber suspensions of fiber mixtures of different shrinkage characteristics, to be fed to the stock inlet. The stock inlet has a number of mixing points, by sections, where the different fiber suspensions are fed into the flow.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Vergleichmäßigung des Eigenschaftsquerprofils einer laufenden Materialbahn aus Papier oder Karton und eine zur Durchführung des obengenannten Verfahrens geeignete Papiermaschine. Das Verfahren ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß das Schrumpfungsquerprofil der Materialbahn während ihres Entstehungsprozesses durch über die Breite sektionale Beeinflussung der örtlichen Zusammensetzung der Stoffsuspension durch das Verändern der Anteile der Komponenten mit unterschiedlichem Schrumpfungsverhalten vergleichmäßigt wird. Die Papiermaschine zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß der Konstante Teil mindestens zwei Bereiche aufweist, die unterschiedliche Stoffsuspensionen mit Fasergemischen mit unterschiedlichem Schrumpfungsverhalten bereitstellen, die Stoffsuspensionszuführungen vom Konstanten Teil zum Stoffauflauf mindestens zwei Stränge für die mindestens zwei unterschiedlichen Stoffsuspensionen aufweisen und im Bereich des Stoffauflaufes eine Vielzahl von sektionalen Mischstellen vorgesehen sind, welche die Stoffsuspensionen mit unterschiedlichen Schrumpfungsverhalten zusammenführen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/26 (2006.01); D21F 1/06 (2006.01); D21F 1/08 (2006.01); D21F 7/06 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01); G01B 21/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/022 (2013.01); D21F 1/08 (2013.01); D21G 9/0027 (2013.01); Y10S 162/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19843729 A1 20000330; AT 254208 T 20031115; AT 334253 T 20060815; CA 2283425 A1 20000324; CA 2283425 C 20081118; DE 59913719 D1 20060907; EP 0995834 A1 20000426; EP 0995834 B1 20031112; EP 1323862 A1 20030702; EP 1323862 B1 20060726; JP 2000096475 A 20000404; US 6303001 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59907702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120705

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120706

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120705

2013-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 254208

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120705

2013-03-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-03-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020801

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI