Global Patent Index - EP 0995838 A2

EP 0995838 A2 2000-04-26 - Utility vehicle with a device to be detachably mounted

Title (en)

Utility vehicle with a device to be detachably mounted

Title (de)

Lastfahrzeug mit einem darauf abnehmbar aufgebauten Aufsatzgerät

Title (fr)

Véhicule utilitaire avec dispositif destiné à être monté de manière détachable

Publication

EP 0995838 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112523 A

Priority

  • DE 19856657 A
  • DE 29907419 U

Abstract (en)

The input of the drive unit (8) is in drive connection with a vehicle running wheel (9) or an axle or shaft connected with it. A torque support (19) connected with the drive unit (8) supports on the additional apparatus (3). The torque support at both ends is provided with an articulated connection and is adjustable in its length. The torque support (19) has a telescopically alterable length corresponding to the spring path of the rear axle and at least one connection is formed as a ball joint (18).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Lastfahrzeug mit einem darauf abnehmbar aufgebauten Aufsatzgerät (3), insbesondere Aufsatzstreugerät, ist zum Antrieb eines Verbrauchers, insbesondere eines Streustoffverteilers (7) und/oder einer Fördereinrichtung des Streugeräts, ein eine Hydraulikpumpe (11) und ggf. ein Getriebe (10) umfassendes Antriebsaggregat (8) vorgesehen. Der Eingang des Antriebsaggregats ist mit einem Fahrzeuglaufrad (9) oder einer mit diesem verbundenen Achse bzw. Welle treibend verbunden. Dabei stützt sich eine mit dem Antriebsaggregat (8) verbundene Drehmomentstütze (19) an dem Aufsatzgerät (3) ab. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/201 (2013.01); E01C 2019/2075 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3737220 A1 19890518 - PIETSCH MAX KG GMBH & CO [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995838 A2 20000426; EP 0995838 A3 20011114; EP 0995838 B1 20030528; AT 241735 T 20030615; DK 0995838 T3 20030623; PL 196788 B1 20080131; PL 336094 A1 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: AEBI SCHMIDT NEDERLAND BV, NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 241735

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20121114

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AEBI SCHMIDT NEDERLAND BV, NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59905728

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59905728

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRAETTINGER MOEHRING VON POSCHINGER PATENTANWA, DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2012-08-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: AEBI SCHMIDT NEDERLAND BV, NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-08-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2012-08-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: AEBI SCHMIDT NEDERLAND BV, NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-07-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120614 AND 20120620

2012-05-30 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20120521

2012-05-30 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20120521

2012-05-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: AEBI SCHMIDT NEDERLAND BV

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20041209

2005-05-04 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20041209

2004-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: KUEPPER-WEISSER GMBH

2004-04-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: KUEPPER-WEISSER GMBH

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2003-09-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030908

2003-08-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905728

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-01 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-07-01 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-06-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-06-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-06-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-05-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030528

2002-07-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011006

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI