Global Patent Index - EP 0995841 A2

EP 0995841 A2 2000-04-26 - Removable guide wall

Title (en)

Removable guide wall

Title (de)

Ortveränderliche Leitwand

Title (fr)

Panneau de guidage amovible

Publication

EP 0995841 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118667 A

Priority

DE 29817773 U

Abstract (en)

The elongated geometrical body (2) is a cylinder, a cuboid, a prism or a body with a cross-section having five or more corners. It comprises individual modules, which are joined (6) to each other rigidly or flexibly. It is internally hollow and consists of standard parts which are tubes. The locator comprises individual supports (3), which are rigidly or flexible joined (4) to one another. Its location surface has a complementary shape to the geometrical body.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine ortsveränderliche Leitwand zur Spurtrennung im Straßenverkehr, bestehend aus einer auf dem Boden angeordneten Auflagevorrichtung (3) und einem darauf aufliegenden langgestreckten geometrischen Körper (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/588 (2016.01); E01F 9/594 (2016.01); E01F 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/0484 (2013.01); E01F 9/588 (2016.02); E01F 9/594 (2016.02); E01F 15/04 (2013.01); E01F 15/0453 (2013.01); E01F 15/0461 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817773 U1 19981224; DE 19941735 A1 20000427; EP 0995841 A2 20000426; EP 0995841 A3 20020710

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-05-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 01F 15/04 A, 7E 01F 9/087 B

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI