Global Patent Index - EP 0995852 A1

EP 0995852 A1 2000-04-26 - Wooden beam and method of production of a wooden beam

Title (en)

Wooden beam and method of production of a wooden beam

Title (de)

Holzbalken und Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Holzbalkens

Title (fr)

Poutre en bois et procédé de fabrication d'une poutre

Publication

EP 0995852 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121181 A

Priority

DE 19849029 A

Abstract (en)

The wood beam (10) is cut to give bonding surfaces where it is to be joined to another component. The bonding surfaces at one side are in a symmetrical mirror image of the surfaces at the diametrically opposite side. The bonding surfaces (36,26) form tongue and groove joints between the beams, in a variety of shapes and structures.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Holzbalken mit zwei sich in Längsrichtung des Balkens erstreckenden und zur Herstellung einer Verbindung mit einem weiteren Bauelement dienenden profilierten Verbindungsflächen und zwei sich ebenfalls in Längsrichtung des Balkens erstreckenden, vorzugsweise im wesentlichen ebenen Sichtflächen wird vorgeschlagen die Verbindungsflächen derart spiegelsymmetrisch anzuordnen, daß eine der Verbindungsflächen durch eine Spiegelung in die andere Verbindungsfläche überführbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/70; B27M 3/00; E04C 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/70 (2006.01); E04C 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/703 (2013.01); E04B 2/702 (2013.01); E04C 3/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29808286 U1 19980917 - KONSTRUKTION HOLZ WERK KHW SEU [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995852 A1 20000426; DE 19849029 A1 20000518

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001027

2002-06-19 [DBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (DELETED)

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEUBERT, KLAUS, DIPL.-ING. (FH)

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONSTRUKTION-HOLZ-WERK SEUBERT KHW GMBH & CO. KG

2002-05-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT

2001-09-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-09 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-08-09 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI