Global Patent Index - EP 0995862 A3

EP 0995862 A3 2001-04-18 - Mortise gearing for inserting in an opening of a hollow section casement of a window, door or the like

Title (en)

Mortise gearing for inserting in an opening of a hollow section casement of a window, door or the like

Title (de)

Einsteck-Getriebe für das Einsetzen in eine Ausnehmung eines Hohlprofils eines Rahmens eines Fensters, einer Tür oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Engrenage encastré à introduire dans une ouverture d'un profil creux de cadre de fenêtre, porte ou analoque

Publication

EP 0995862 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99117956 A

Priority

DE 19848956 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0995862A2] The geared drive mechanism (1), for insertion into an opening in the hollow profile of a window or door frame, has a swing spacer (20,20') with the threaded drilling (28) for the mounting screw (61). The thickness of the spacer (20,20') is equal to or smaller than the thickness of the section of the mechanism (1) gripping within the hollow profile, or the width of the head (3) of the housing (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 9/00; E05B 9/08; E05C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/00 (2006.01); E05B 9/08 (2006.01); E05C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2013.01); E05B 9/00 (2013.01); E05B 9/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995862 A2 20000426; EP 0995862 A3 20010418; EP 0995862 B1 20040225; DE 19848956 C1 20000518; ES 2217660 T3 20041101

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120915

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908629

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120915

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111013

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100916

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110811

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110815

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100915

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090903

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217660 T3

2004-07-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908629 P 20040401

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010822

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 9/00 A, 7E 05C 9/04 B, 7E 05B 9/08 B

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI