Global Patent Index - EP 0995863 A2

EP 0995863 A2 2000-04-26 - Insertable clip for blind fastening of a door lock casing

Title (en)

Insertable clip for blind fastening of a door lock casing

Title (de)

Einsteckklammer zur Blindbefestigung eines Türschlossgehäuses

Title (fr)

Agrafe d'épinglage pour fixation aveugle d'un boîtier de serrure de porte

Publication

EP 0995863 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120658 A

Priority

DE 19849179 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19849179C1] The retaining bracket (1) for a vehicle door lock casing has a ring shape to spring fit behind a shoulder on the lock casing. The ring has support arms (21) extending along the outer wall of the lock casing, each with an outwardly angled support finger (22) having a tip lug (23) for centralizing on the wall of the receiving panel aperture.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Einsteckklammer dient zur Blindbefestigung eines Türschloßgehäuses im Loch eines Türbleches. Das zylinderförmig ausgebildete Gehäuse ( 2 ) ist hierbei mit einem Auflageflansch ( 5 ) an der Einführseite sowie einer ringförmigen Erweiterung ( 7 ) am entgegengesetzten Ende der Außenwand ( 6 ) versehen. Zur verdrehsicheren Aufnahme im Loch ( 3 ) des Türbleches ( 4 ) sind an der Außenwand ( 6 ) radial nach außen abstehende, einander gegenüberliegende Vorsprünge ( 11 ) vorgesehen, welche in entsprechende Aussparungen ( 16 ) des Aufnahmeloches ( 3 ) eintauchen. Die Einsteckklammer ( 1 ) besteht aus einem durch einen Querspalt unterbrochenen Stützring ( 17 ) mit mehreren Stützarmen ( 21 ), die an ihren freien Enden je zwei schräg nach außen abstehende Stützfinger ( 22 ) sowie zwischen den Stützfingern ( 22 ) achsparallel verlaufende Zentrierlappen ( 23 ) aufweisen. Beim Aufdrücken der Einsteckklammer ( 1 ) auf das Gehäuse ( 2 ) wird der Stützring ( 17 ) zunächst auseinandergedrückt und legt sich nach dem Einrasten hinter der ringförmigen Erweiterung ( 7 ) federnd an der Außenwand ( 6 ) an. Beim anschließenden Einführen des vormontierten Türschloßgehäuses ( 2 ) rasten die Stützfinger ( 22 ) hinter dem Aufnahmeloch ( 3 ) ein, während die Zentrierlappen ( 23 ) sich am Rand ( 24 ) des Loches ( 3 ) anlegen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/00 (2006.01); E05B 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/084 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 8911765 U1 19910131

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19849179 C1 20000323; CZ 297461 B6 20061213; CZ 9903747 A3 20000614; EP 0995863 A2 20000426; EP 0995863 A3 20020306; EP 0995863 B1 20040630

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: A. *RAYMOND & CIE

- Effective date: 20041031

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061019

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061019

2005-09-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: A. RAYMOND & CIE

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909845 P 20040805

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020906

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: COLLAS, JEAN

2000-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FREITAS, JOACHIM

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI