Global patent index - EP 0995869 A1

EP 0995869 A1 2000-04-26 - Antitheft device for a vehicle where locked doors can be unlocked from the inside

Title (en)

Antitheft device for a vehicle where locked doors can be unlocked from the inside

Title (de)

Diebstahlsicherungseinrichtung für ein Fahrzeug mit vom Fahrzeuginneren aus entriegelbar verriegelten Türen

Title (fr)

Dispositif anti-vol pour véhicule dans lequel les portes verrouillées pouvent être déverrouillées de l'intérieur du véhicule

Publication

EP 0995869 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119544 A

Priority

DE 19848449 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19848449C1] The motor vehicle inner door handle has a lock actuator catch (4) mounted on the pull grip (1). In the frame behind the grip is a keeper (5) for the grip catch. To release the catch requires the pressure of at least one finger positioned behind the grip, to prevent pulling of the grip and release of the lock by a thief using a pull wire.

Abstract (de)

Es soll eine Diebstahlsicherungseinrichtung für ein Fahrzeug mit einem an der Innenseite mindestens einer der Fahrzeugtüren angebrachten, bei verriegelter Tür wirksam von Hand betätigbaren Türentriegelungs-Zuggriff geschaffen werden. Eine solche Diebstahlsicherung zeichnet sich aus durch die Merkmale bei verriegelter Tür greift eine Betätigungs-Sperrvorrichtung an dem Zuggriff an, in dem Raum hinter dem Zuggriff ist eine Einrichtung zum Aufheben der Betätigungssperre des Zuggriffes vorgesehen, zur Betätigung der Einrichtung zum Aufheben der Betätigungssperre ist diese mit einer Kraft zu beaufschlagen, die derjenigen entgegengerichtet ist, mit der der Zuggriff zu betätigen ist, bei einer durch eine Hand erfolgenden Betätigung des Zuggriffes drückt mindestens ein den Zuggriff nach hinten umgreifender Finger allein durch seine Größe zwangsläufig im Sinne einer Aufhebung der Türentriegelungssperre auf die Einrichtung zum Aufheben der Betätigungssperre und hebt diese damit auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 25/00 (2006.01); E05B 1/00 (2006.01); E05B 77/28 (2014.01); E05B 85/12 (2014.01); E05B 13/00 (2006.01); E05B 85/10 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/12 (2013.01); E05B 77/283 (2013.01); E05B 13/002 (2013.01); E05B 85/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19848449 C1 20000105; EP 0995869 A1 20000426; JP 2000160882 A 20000613

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020502

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI