Global patent index - EP 0995877 A1

EP 0995877 A1 2000-04-26 - Apparatus and method for information transmission by electromagnetic waves

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for information transmission by electromagnetic waves

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Übertragung von Nachrichten mittels elektromagnetischer Wellen

Title (fr)

Méthode et système de transmission d'informations par onde électromagnétique

Publication

EP 0995877 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402571 A

Priority

FR 9813304 A

Abstract (en)

Electromagnetic cased well information transmission comprises electrical insulation of metal casing tubes adjacent low resistivity formation layers. Information transmission from a cased well, using a downhole transmitter/receiver operating by guided electromagnetic waves created by electrical signal injection by a dipole connected to the metal casing tubes which guide the emitted waves comprises identifying low resistivity formation layers which cause transmission attenuation, and electrically insulating the tubes located at these layers. An Independent claim is also included for a system for carrying out the above information transmission method. Preferred Features: A mathematical model is used to calculate the minimum length to be insulated, taking into account the minimum characteristics of the electromagnetic transmission, especially the transmission distance and/or the information output rate. Insulation is effected by providing a cement-type insulating material in the gap between the casing tubes and certain formations. The transmitter/receiver is positioned near the lower end of a production tubing string, for transmitting bottom measurements or bottom equipment commands, or is positioned near the lower end of a well casing for transmitting bottom or drilling parameters or location measurements.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne une méthode et un système de transmission d'informations depuis un puits (1; 20) foré à travers des couches (3) de formation géologique et cuvelé au moins en partie par des tubes métalliques (4; 23, 24; 31). La méthode comprend la mise en place dans ledit puits d'un émetteur/récepteur d'informations (E) fonctionnant par le moyen d'ondes électromagnétiques créées par l'injection d'un signal électrique par un dipôle (P1-P2) relié conductivement aux tubes métalliques servant au guidage des ondes émises. Dans la méthode, on identifie l'atténuation de la transmission par certaines couches de formation (3a, 3b; 25; 30) ayant une faible résistivité, puis on isole électriquement au moins partiellement les tubes métalliques disposés au droit des couches de faible résistivité. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 47/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/13 (2012.01); E21B 47/12 (2012.01); G01V 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995877 A1 20000426; EP 0995877 B1 20030507; BR 9905102 A 20001003; BR 9905102 B1 20100824; CA 2286435 A1 20000423; CA 2286435 C 20060314; CN 1154251 C 20040616; CN 1251480 A 20000426; DE 69907597 D1 20030612; DE 69907597 T2 20040318; ES 2198865 T3 20040201; FR 2785017 A1 20000428; FR 2785017 B1 20001222; NO 315247 B1 20030804; NO 995019 A 20000425; NO 995019 D0 19991014; RU 2206739 C2 20030620; US 6628206 B1 20030930

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151012

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151013

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151014

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150915

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-02-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090115 AND 20090121

2008-11-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: GEOSERVICES EQUIPEMENTS SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20080821

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2198865

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69907597

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020514

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT NL

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI