Global Patent Index - EP 0995878 A2

EP 0995878 A2 2000-04-26 - Rock anchor and borehole with said anchor installed

Title (en)

Rock anchor and borehole with said anchor installed

Title (de)

Anker sowie Bohrloch mit gesetztem Anker

Title (fr)

Boulon d'ancrage et puits de forage avec ledit boulon posé

Publication

EP 0995878 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890325 A

Priority

AT 175798 A

Abstract (en)

A brace, with a tension element (3) carrying a molded end part (9) joined fluid-tightly to an outer sleeve (10), is new. A brace has a tension element (3) with several individual tension elements (especially of steel), an injection pipe (15) for injecting hardenable material (e.g. a cement mortar or a reactive plastic mixture) into a drilled hole, an outer sleeve (10) which encloses the tension element and which has a slip-resistant outer surface (especially an undulating surface, e.g. a thread) and optionally a bolt head. The hole base end of the tension element (3) carries a molded end part (9) which abuts the outer sleeve (10) and which is fluid-tightly joined to the sleeve (10), especially by a rubber-elastic casing (11, 13). An Independent claim is also included for a drilled hole in which the above brace is inserted.

Abstract (de)

Anker, insbesondere Gebirgsanker, mit einem Zugglied (3), das mit einer Mehrzahl einzelner Einzelzugglieder (5), insbesondere aus Stahl, aufgebaut ist, einer Injektonsleitung (15), zumindest zum Bohrlochgrund, für erhärtendes Material, z. B. Zementmörtel, reaktive Kunststoffmischung, einer das Zugglied (3) umgebenden äußeren Umhüllung (10), mit einer Außenfläche, die einen erhöhten Widerstand gegen Verschiebung in Längsrichtung des Zuggliedes, insbesondere einen wellen- oder mäanderförmigen Längsschnitt, z. B. von einem auf der äußeren Umhüllung geformten Rundgewinde, aufweist und gegebenenfalls einem am Gebirge od. dgl. im oberen Kopfbereich des Ankers vorgesehenen Ankerkopf, und wobei am bohrlochgrundseitigen Ende der äußeren Umhüllung (10) das Zugglied (3) an dieser angreifbar ist, und wobei das Zugglied (3) am bohrlochgrundseitigen Ende einen angeformten Endteil (9) trägt, der an der äußeren Umhüllung (10), insbesondere am Stirnende derselben, abstützbar ist und daß der Endteil (9) mit der äußeren Umhüllung (10), insbesondere über ein gummielastisches Hüllstück (11, 13), fluiddicht verbunden ist. Zur Veröffentlichung gemeinsam mit der Zusammenfassung ist Fig. 1 bestimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21D 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21D 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 21/0033 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995878 A2 20000426; EP 0995878 A3 20031029; AT 408473 B 20011227; AT A175798 A 20010415

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-08-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-07-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI