Global Patent Index - EP 0995879 A1

EP 0995879 A1 2000-04-26 - Twin feed screw rotors

Title (en)

Twin feed screw rotors

Title (de)

Zwillings-Förderschraubenrotoren

Title (fr)

Vis transporteuses jumelées

Publication

EP 0995879 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811063 A

Priority

EP 98811063 A

Abstract (en)

The twin-screw rotor structure, for use in displacement machines for compressible materials and media, has a pitch which is not constant, and is defined by a variable related to the working angle round it. The pitch in the first section increases ( DELTA W1) from the entry end to a max. value after one turn angle. The following section has a reduced pitch to a min. value at a point of one turn angle before the outlet. The last, and third section, has a constant pitch ( DELTA W3). The spirals (7) have a constant thickness (h).

Abstract (de)

In bekannten Ausführungen von Verdrängermaschinen für kompressible Medien arbeiten eingängige Zwillingsschraubenrotoren mit kontinuierlich abnehmender Steigung zur Erzielung einer inneren Kompression. In einigen Fällen wird diese Wirkung durch Variation der Stimprofile verstärkt oder ersetzt. Die Forderung nach kompakten Pumpen mit möglichst kurzen Rotoren sowie die häufige, prozessbedingte Forderung einer schnellen Demontage des Gehäuses zu Reinigungszwecken setzen dort jedoch Grenzen für die Umschlingungswinkel bzw. für die Variation der Stirnprofile, welches wiederum zu extremen Steigungsverhältnissen oder zu ungenügenden Kompressionsraten führt. Vorliegende Erfindung löst diese Probleme durch Einsatz von Schraubenrotoren (2) mit optimiertem, nicht monotonem Steigungsverlauf w1, w3) und wahlweiser Stirnprofilvariation bei konstanten Durchmessern. Bei gleichem Raumbedarf wird das Saugvermögen verbessert und es werden bei nur vier Umschlingungen mühelos Verdichtungsraten von 3,0 und mehr erzielt. Mit solchen Zwillingsschraubenrotoren bestücke Verdrängermaschinen bieten optimale Verhältnisse bezüglich Energiebedarf, Temperatur, Bauraum, Service mit Einsatzmöglichkeiten in Chemie und Halbleitertechnik. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01C 1/08; F01C 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 18/16 (2006.01); F01C 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01C 1/084 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995879 A1 20000426; EP 0995879 B1 20040512; AR 020939 A1 20020605; AT 266800 T 20040515; AU 5846499 A 20000515; BG 105371 A 20011031; BG 64490 B1 20050430; BR 9914716 A 20010807; CA 2347781 A1 20000504; CA 2347781 C 20081014; CN 1113151 C 20030702; CN 1324429 A 20011128; CZ 20010514 A3 20011212; CZ 296509 B6 20060315; DE 59811390 D1 20040617; EE 200100230 A 20020617; ES 2221141 T3 20041216; JP 2002528668 A 20020903; JP 3955731 B2 20070808; PA 8484601 A1 20011214; PE 14302000 A1 20001215; PL 202371 B1 20090630; PL 347374 A1 20020408; SK 2182001 A3 20011106; TR 200101123 T2 20010821; US 6447276 B1 20020910; WO 0025004 A1 20000504

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091024

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091023

2011-03-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110310

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091023

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091023

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091023

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-07-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-05-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. ATELIERS *BUSCH

- Effective date: 20091031

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081003

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081008

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081008

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041012

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2221141 T3

2004-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-10-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041023

2004-08-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-08-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-08-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-08-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811390 P 20040617

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-05-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000929;LT PAYMENT 20000929;LV PAYMENT 20000929;MK PAYMENT 20000929;RO PAYMENT 20000929;SI PAYMENT 20000929

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI