Global Patent Index - EP 0995880 A2

EP 0995880 A2 2000-04-26 - Turbine blade

Title (en)

Turbine blade

Title (de)

Turbinenschaufel

Title (fr)

Aube de turbine

Publication

EP 0995880 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810915 A

Priority

DE 19848104 A

Abstract (en)

The turbine blade (1) has a protective coating (10) of porous intermetallic felt. The blade body has internal cooling air channels (13), which open into the felt to supply it with cooling air. The felt is located in a front (4) or rear edge (5) of the blade, and is contained within a recessed aperture, so that its aligned with the neighboring parts of the blade. The felt is formed from compressed sintered intermetallic fibers on iron or nickel base. The fibers may have an anti-corrosion and/or heat protection coating.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Turbinenschaufel mit einem metallischen Schaufelkörper und einem Schutzüberzug, der aus einem porösen Intermetallik-Filz ausgebildet ist und im Schaufelkörper der Turbinenschaufel Kühlluftkanäle ausgebildet sind, welche am Intermetallik-Filz münden, um diesen mit Kühlluft zu versorgen. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß der Intermetallik-Filz auf einer Eisen- oder Nickel-Aluminid-Legierung basiert, mit Mischungsanteilen zwischen Fe:AI bzw. Ni:Al von ca. 50:50, und daß der Schutzüberzug Kühlkanäle 13' aufweist, die, dem Schaufelkörper zugewandt, im Bereich der Kühlkanäle münden. Durch die erfindungsgemäße Ausgestaltung der Turbinenschaufeln kann deren Kühlung mit einer geringen Menge an Kühlluft bewerkstelligt werden, und aufgrund der verbesserten Aerodynamik und geringeren Kühlluftzufuhr wird der Wirkungsgrad einer Turbine wesentlich gesteigert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 7/00 (2006.01); C22C 49/14 (2006.01); F01D 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/183 (2013.01); B22F 7/004 (2013.01); C22C 49/14 (2013.01); F01D 5/186 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19848104 A1 20000420; EP 0995880 A2 20000426; EP 0995880 A3 20020123; EP 0995880 B1 20031203; US 6241469 B1 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59907926

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59907926

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040213

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907926 P 20040115

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020711

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 01D 5/18 A, 7F 01D 5/28 B

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI