Global Patent Index - EP 0995881 A2

EP 0995881 A2 2000-04-26 - Sealing arrangement

Title (en)

Sealing arrangement

Title (de)

Dichtungsanordnung

Title (fr)

Joint d'étanchéité

Publication

EP 0995881 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810907 A

Priority

DE 19848103 A

Abstract (en)

A felt seal (3) between two adjoining blade bases (1,2) in either moving or fixed blade sets, or again between either set of blades and the adjoining turbine part, e.g. housing or combustion chamber, positively conforms to the base shape and can be welded or bonded to the blade base (1). The seal is sufficiently porous to be air-permeable.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Dichtungsanordnung zur Reduzierung von Leckströmen innerhalb einer Strömungsrotationsmaschine, vorzugsweise einer axialen Turbomaschine, mit Lauf- und Leitschaufeln, die jeweils in wenigstens einer Lauf- bzw. Leitschaufelreihe angeordnet sind und Schaufelfüsse aufweisen, über die die einzelnen Lauf- und Leitschaufeln mit Befestigungskonturen verbunden sind. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß zwischen wenigstens zwei benachbarten Schaufelfüßen innerhalb einer Leit- oder Laufschaufelreihe oder zwischen Leit- und/oder Laufschaufeln und benachbarten Komponenten der Strömungsmaschine ein filzartiges Material aufweisendes Dichtelement vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 11/00; F16J 15/08; F16J 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/00 (2006.01); F02C 7/28 (2006.01); F16J 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/006 (2013.01); F01D 11/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995881 A2 20000426; EP 0995881 A3 20020313; EP 0995881 B1 20040107; DE 19848103 A1 20000420; JP 2000120401 A 20000425; JP 4465067 B2 20100519; US 6312218 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908238

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2017-10-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Effective date: 20170914

2017-09-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170824 AND 20170830

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD, CH

- Effective date: 20161110

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59908238

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59908238

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908238

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Effective date: 20120918

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59908238

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59908238

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59908238

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908238

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-08-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120802 AND 20120808

2012-07-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908238

- Representative's name: UWE ROESLER, DE

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908238 P 20040212

2004-02-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BEECK, ALEXANDER DR.

2003-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NAZMY, MOHAMED DR.

2003-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEIGAND, BERNHARD DR.

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021111

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020824

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI