Global Patent Index - EP 0995882 A3

EP 0995882 A3 2000-05-17 - Hydraulic variable phasing device between a driving pulley and a shaft

Title (en)

Hydraulic variable phasing device between a driving pulley and a shaft

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur hydraulischen Drehwinkelverstellung einer Welle zu einem Antriebsrad

Title (fr)

Dispositif hydraulique de variation de phase entre une poulie d'entrainement et un arbre

Publication

EP 0995882 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99116481 A

Priority

DE 19848653 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0995882A2] The system to give a hydraulic adjustment to the angular setting of a shaft (1) in relation to a drive wheel, uses a wheel where the inner section (2) is divided into pockets by webs (4a-4d) and into pressure zones (7a-7d;8a-8d) at each pocket by webs or paddles (6a-6d). The rotation is applied by an increase or decrease in the pressure applied to the webs or paddles, which differ in both directions on the same running conditions of the motor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/344

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34 (2006.01); F01L 1/344 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/3442 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995882 A2 20000426; EP 0995882 A3 20000517; DE 19848653 A1 20000427; JP 2000136705 A 20000516

INPADOC legal status


2001-04-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010208

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI