Global patent index - EP 0995885 A2

EP 0995885 A2 2000-04-26 - Rocker arm device for simultaneous control of valve lift and relative timing in a combustion engine

Title (en)

Rocker arm device for simultaneous control of valve lift and relative timing in a combustion engine

Title (de)

Schlepphebelanordnung für gleichzeitige Ventil-Hub und Winkelsteuerung in einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Culbuteur pour le contrôle simultané de la levée de soupape et de son calage dans un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0995885 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99308287 A

Priority

IT MI982244 A

Abstract (en)

A valve control system including a valve actuating camshaft (A), having a high lift cam (B) and a low lift cam (C), and an outer rocker arm (2) engaging the high lift cam, and an inner rocker arm (3) engaging the low lift cam. The ends of the rocker arms adjacent the engine poppet valve (V) are fixed to each other by a connector pin (37). The system includes a latching mechanism disposed at the ends of the rocker arms opposite the connector pin (37). Latching of the rocker arms is accomplished by a compound pin (8) moved between latched (FIG. 14A) and unlatched (FIG. 14B) conditions in response to movement of an actuator (9). The system also includes a rocker ratio varying device, such that, during operation in the low lift mode, the lift can be gradually increased as the engine speed increases. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 13/00; F01L 1/18; F01L 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/18 (2006.01); F01L 1/24 (2006.01); F01L 1/34 (2006.01); F01L 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/185 (2013.01); F01L 1/2405 (2013.01); F01L 13/0036 (2013.01); F01L 13/0063 (2013.01); F01L 2105/02 (2013.01); F01L 2820/033 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995885 A2 20000426; EP 0995885 A3 20000719; EP 0995885 B1 20050112; BR 9906075 A 20000905; DE 69923139 D1 20050217; DE 69923139 T2 20051229; IT 1302701 B1 20000929; IT MI982244 A1 20000421; IT MI982244 D0 19981020; JP 2000130132 A 20000509; JP 4541471 B2 20100908

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151016

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69923139

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-02-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031010

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010109

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI