Global Patent Index - EP 0995893 A2

EP 0995893 A2 2000-04-26 - Cast internal combustion engine block

Title (en)

Cast internal combustion engine block

Title (de)

Gegossenes Maschinengehäuse einer Hubkolbenmaschine, insbesondere Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Bloc moulé à moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0995893 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118689 A

Priority

DE 19849080 A

Abstract (en)

The machine housing has a crankshaft cradle (5) in a transverse wall (4) between cylinders, whereby the cradle is connected to a housing boundary (9) via hollow channels (8) in the transverse wall on both sides of a connecting surface for a bearing plate (7). Threaded bores (10) in the cradle accept bearing plate bolts. The outer profile of the housing boundary, which is in one piece with the cradle, causes a waisted cross-sectional shape (13) in the cradle.

Abstract (de)

Für ein gegossenes Maschinengehäuse (1) einer Hubkolbenmaschine, insbesondere Brennkraftmaschine (2), bei dem ein Kurbelwellen-Lagerstuhl (5) in einer Gehäuse-Querwand (4) angeordnet und über Hohlkehlen (8) mit Gehäusebegrenzungen (9) in Verbindung steht, wird zur Kraftflußlenkung weg von den Hohlkehlen (8) vorgeschlagen, daß der Lagerstuhl (5) im Bereich von Gewindebohrungen (10) für die Verschraubung eines Lagerdeckels (7) - in Maschinenlängsrichtung gesehen - mit einem taillierten Querschnittsverlauf (13) ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/0053 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995893 A2 20000426; EP 0995893 A3 20010110; EP 0995893 B1 20090617; DE 19849080 A1 20000427; DE 59915038 D1 20090730; ES 2325006 T3 20090821

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100318

2009-08-21 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2325006 T3

2009-07-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59915038 P 20090730

2009-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-06-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040923

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI