Global Patent Index - EP 0995906 A1

EP 0995906 A1 2000-04-26 - Motor-driven double pump of the centrifugal type

Title (en)

Motor-driven double pump of the centrifugal type

Title (de)

Motorgetriebene Doppelpumpe der Kreiselpumpenbauart

Title (fr)

Pompe centrifuge double entrainée par un moteur

Publication

EP 0995906 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118562 A

Priority

DE 29818704 U

Abstract (en)

The double pump has a common shaft with two pump rotors, each in its own chamber. The discharge opening (20,22) of each pump chamber (8,10) is connected to a rigid outlet pipe (12,13), and chambers and pipes are immersed into the medium to be pumped. The pipes and the pump shaft (19) extend to a fastener unit (14) for the double pump, located at an axial distance to the pump chambers and outside the medium. The other end of each outlet pipe has a connection socket (16,17) in the area of the fastener unit. The fastener unit consists of a carrier plate (25) with a central passage (26) for the pump shaft.

Abstract (de)

Die motorgetriebene Doppelpumpe (1) der Kreiselpumpenbauart umfasst eine gemeinsame, durch einen Elektromotor (18) angetriebene Pumpenwelle (19) mit zwei nahe beieinander angeordneten, je in einer eigenen Pumpenkammer (8, 10) umlaufenden Kreiselpumpenrädern (9, 11) zum Fördern jeweils eines eigenen Förderstromes aus demselben Fördermedium. Für die beiden an dem einen Pumpenwellenende vorgesehenen Pumpenkammern (8, 10) sind je eine Einsaugöffnung (20, 22) und eine Auslassöffnung für den jeweiligen Förderstrom vorgesehen. An die Auslassöffnung jeder Pumpenkammer (8, 10) schließt sich ein starres, zusammen mit diesen beiden Kammern in das Fördermedium eintauchbares Abförderrohr (12, 13) an, das sich zusammen mit der Pumpenwelle (19) bis zu einer axial von den Pumpenkammern (8, 10) beabstandeten Befestigungseinrichtung (14) für eine außerhalb des Fördermediums vorgesehene Befestigung der Doppelpumpe (1) erstreckt. Das andere Ende der beiden Abförderrohre (12, 13) ist im Bereich der Befestigungseinrichtung (14) je mit einem Anschlussstutzen (16, 17) versehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 13/12; F04D 13/08; F04D 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/08 (2006.01); F04D 13/12 (2006.01); F04D 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/14 (2013.01); F04D 13/08 (2013.01); F04D 13/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29818704 U1 19981224; EP 0995906 A1 20000426

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040608

2004-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040126

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI