Global patent index - EP 0995910 A1

EP 0995910 A1 2000-04-26 - Vortex valve

Title (en)

Vortex valve

Title (de)

Wirbelventil

Title (fr)

Soupape à tourbillon

Publication

EP 0995910 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811044 A

Priority

EP 98811044 A

Abstract (en)

The eddy valve (10) has a fixed inner flow guide. The flow guide forms a resistance to the flow through the valve in one direction, and a stronger resistance in the opposite flow direction through the development of an eddy. The flow guide is a twisting zone (14) concentric to the valve axis (19), with a number of flow twisting units (13) round its periphery. The twisting zone (14) has an axial transit into a neighboring and concentric twisting tube (18).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Wirbelventil (10), bei welchem innerhalb des Ventils feststehende strömungsleitende Mittel vorgesehen sind, welche einer durch das Ventil in einer Richtung hindurchgehenden Strömung einen ersten Widerstand entgegensetzen, und welche einer durch das Ventil in der umgekehrten Richtung hindurchgehenden Strömung aufgrund von Wirbelbildung einen zweiten, wesentlich grösseren Widerstand entgegensetzen, wird eine Vereinfachung in der Geometrie und Konstruktion sowie der Herstellung dadurch erreicht, dass die strömungsleitenden Mittel einen konzentrisch zu einer Ventilachse (19) angeordneten Drallraum (14) umfassen, an dessen Umfang eine Mehrzahl von drallerzeugenden Elementen (13) angeordnet ist, und dass der Drallraum (14) in axialer Richtung in ein angrenzendes, konzentrisches Drallrohr (18) übergeht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15C 1/16; F15D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15C 1/16 (2006.01); F15D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15D 1/0015 (2013.01); F15C 1/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • US 4932861 A 19900612 - KELLER JAKOB [CH], et al
  • LOTH,J.L. ET AL: "pulse jet one-way valve performance, aiaa 28th joint propulsion conference and exhibit, nashville, july 6-8, 1992", article "wislicenus aero- valve (fig. 4)", pages: 1 - 6

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5070972 A 19911210 - DOURSON STEPHEN E [US], et al
  • [A] EP 0147281 A2 19850703 - NOVATOME [FR]
  • [A] US 3712321 A 19730123 - BAUER A
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 166 (M - 093) 23 October 1981 (1981-10-23)
  • [DA] LOTH, J.L., MONTGOMERY, L., AND CHANDRAN, R.: "Pulse Jet One-Way Valve Performance", AIAA 28TH JOINT PROPULSION CONFERENCE AND EXHIBIT, 6 July 1992 (1992-07-06) - 8 July 1992 (1992-07-08), Nashville, USA, pages 1 - 6, XP002097388

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995910 A1 20000426

INPADOC legal status

2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI