Global Patent Index - EP 0995947 A1

EP 0995947 A1 2000-04-26 - Signalling lamp with lamp holder integrated to the base

Title (en)

Signalling lamp with lamp holder integrated to the base

Title (de)

Signalleuchte mit einem an dem Sockel integriertem Lampenträger

Title (fr)

Feu de signalisation à porte-lampe integré au socle

Publication

EP 0995947 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402498 A

Priority

FR 9813200 A

Abstract (en)

The signal lamp has a base unit (2) comprising lateral walls to which the lamp cover (17,19) is fitted, and a lamp holder (10) at the back part of the base unit. The electric circuit (14) supplying the lamp is formed from sheet metal and is on the surface of the lamp base unit, so that it is accessible from the front of the lamp. The lamp holder is molded integrally with the lamp base unit.

Abstract (fr)

Le feu de signalisation pour véhicule comporte un socle (2), un porte-lampe (10) situé en partie arrière du socle (2) et un circuit (14) électriquement conducteur rapporté sur le porte-lampe. Le feu est adapté à recevoir le circuit (14) depuis une partie avant du socle (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/212 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995947 A1 20000426; EP 0995947 B1 20030312; DE 69905834 D1 20030417; DE 69905834 T2 20040304; ES 2194427 T3 20031116; FR 2785036 A1 20000428; FR 2785036 B1 20010119

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091013

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110303

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091012

2011-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110304

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081020

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081010

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071012

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071012

2006-09-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060926

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2194427 T3

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905834 P 20030417

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI