Global Patent Index - EP 0995950 A2

EP 0995950 A2 2000-04-26 - Domestic cooking hob, with gas burner having variable positioning

Title (en)

Domestic cooking hob, with gas burner having variable positioning

Title (de)

Kochmulde mit positionierbarem Gasbrenner

Title (fr)

Plaque de cuisson avec brûleur à gaz à position variable

Publication

EP 0995950 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99204365 A

Priority

  • EP 95105004 A
  • IT TO940261 A

Abstract (en)

A domestic cooking hob is described, of the type comprising a plurality of gas burners (11-16), for the heating of cooking containers, whereby at least a first burner (11,12; 30,31) is provided, comprising a body and a burner tap of an elongated form, in particular elliptical, and that said body and burner tap element are able to assume two different positions in function of the type of container to be heated on said first burner and/or in function of the container to be heated placed on a second burner (12,11; 31,30) of said cooking hob. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 3/08; F24C 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/08 (2006.01); F24C 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/085 (2013.01); F24C 15/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0676591 A2 19951011; EP 0676591 A3 19970212; EP 0676591 B1 20000927; DE 69518939 D1 20001102; DE 69518939 T2 20010208; DE 69525079 D1 20020221; DE 69525079 T2 20020620; EP 0995950 A2 20000426; EP 0995950 A3 20000524; EP 0995950 B1 20011121; ES 2151564 T3 20010101; ES 2168834 T3 20020616; IT 1273116 B 19970704; IT TO940261 A1 19951009; IT TO940261 D0 19940408

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130404

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130404

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120510

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090406

2010-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090406

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080506

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080507

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2168834

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69525079

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-21

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 676591

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010220

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT;SI

2000-04-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 676591

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT;SI