Global Patent Index - EP 0995955 A2

EP 0995955 A2 2000-04-26 - Smoke protection device for staircases or similar

Title (en)

Smoke protection device for staircases or similar

Title (de)

Rauchschutzeinrichtung für Treppenräume oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection contre la fumée dans un escalier ou similaire

Publication

EP 0995955 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117848 A

Priority

DE 19848736 A

Abstract (en)

The smoke protection device has a ventilation system mounted in a stair well (10) or similar to produce an overpressure, at least one smoke detector or manual trigger, a circuit connected to the ventilation system and detector to switch on the ventilation system when smoke exists. At least one overpressure flap (15) forming a component for producing and maintaining a predefined overpressure is mounted in a ceiling or wall (14) between the stair well or lift shaft and an adjacent room (12) or the exterior, and is used to produce a pressure difference between the stair well and the room or exterior Independent claims are also included for a fire protection arrangement and for a smoke protection method.

Abstract (de)

Rauchschutzeinrichtung für Gebäude mit einer in einem Treppenraum oder ähnlich zu sichernden Raum anzuordnenden, zur Herstellung eines Überdrucks bestimmten, wenigstens einen Ventilator aufweisenden Belüftungsanlage, mit wenigstens einem Rauchmelder oder einem Handauslöser, einer an die Belüftungsanlage und den Rauchmelder angeschlossenen Schaltungsanordnung zum Einschalten der Belüftungsanlage beim Auftreten von Rauch, wenigstens einer in einem unteren Bereich des Gebäudes befindlichen Zuluftöffnung und wenigstens einer in einem oberen Bereich des Gebäudes befindlichen Abluftöffnung sowie mit wenigstens einem Bauelement, das mit der Belüftungsanlage, der Zuluftöffnung und der Abluftöffnung eine Einrichtung zur Herstellung und Aufrechterhaltung eines vorgewählten Überdrucks im Treppenraum nach dem Ansprechen des Rauchmelders bilden kann, wobei als Bauelement zur Herstellung und Aufrechterhaltung eines vorgewählten Überdrucks im Treppenraum (10) wenigstens eine Überdruckklappe (15) vorgesehen ist, die im Wandbereich oder Deckenbereich einer Zwischenwand (14) oder Zwischendecke zwischen dem Treppenraum oder dem Aufzugsschacht und einem nachgeschalteten Raum (12) oder dem Außenbereich angeordnet ist und mittels derer ein Differenzdruck zwischen dem Treppenraum (10) oder dem Aufzugsschacht und dem nachgeschalteten Raum oder dem Außenbereich erzeugt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 2/12 (2006.01); F24F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 2/12 (2013.01); F24F 7/06 (2013.01); F24F 2011/0004 (2013.01); F24F 2011/0095 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 9409176 U1 19951012 - PAFAMAX BRANDSCHUTZTECH GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995955 A2 20000426; EP 0995955 A3 20021030; DE 19848736 A1 20000504; DE 19848736 B4 20041111

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI