Global Patent Index - EP 0995957 A3

EP 0995957 A3 2000-11-02 - Refrigeration apparatus with temperature balancing device

Title (en)

Refrigeration apparatus with temperature balancing device

Title (de)

Kältegerät mit Temperaturausgleichseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil frigorifique avec dispositif d'équilibrage de température

Publication

EP 0995957 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99117317 A

Priority

IT PN980076 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0995957A2] The refrigeration apparatus comprises a cold storage compartment (3), a freezing compartment (4) and a compressor-driven refrigerating circuit adapted to keep said compartments at respective temperatures by means of cyclic operation phases of the compressor (8). In the cold storage compartment (3) there is provided an internal lighting lamp (6) that is operable also as a temperature balancing device with a variable power according to a pre-set reference temperature (Tr) and the room temperature (Ta). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 29/00; F25D 11/02; F25D 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 27/00 (2006.01); F25D 29/00 (2006.01); F25D 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 29/00 (2013.01); F25D 27/005 (2013.01); F25D 11/02 (2013.01); F25D 2400/04 (2013.01); F25D 2400/34 (2013.01); F25D 2700/02 (2013.01); F25D 2700/12 (2013.01); F25D 2700/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995957 A2 20000426; EP 0995957 A3 20001102; EP 0995957 B1 20040428; DE 69916739 D1 20040603; DE 69916739 T2 20040930; ES 2221275 T3 20041216; IT 1305526 B1 20010509; IT PN980076 A1 20000424

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090904

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110704

2011-07-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110714

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090903

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090903

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090903

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080822

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080811

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080916

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2221275 T3

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916739 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS ITALY S.P.A.

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI