Global Patent Index - EP 0995961 A2

EP 0995961 A2 2000-04-26 - Stacked type multi-flow heat exchanger

Title (en)

Stacked type multi-flow heat exchanger

Title (de)

Mehrstromwärmetauscher in Stapelbauweise

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur du type empilé à passage multiple

Publication

EP 0995961 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99308314 A

Priority

  • JP 30282598 A
  • JP 2603099 A

Abstract (en)

A stacked type multi-flow heat exchanger (1) includes a plurality of heat transfer tubes (2) and fins (3) stacked alternately, and upper front (31a) and an upper rear tank (31b), a lower front (32a) and a lower rear tank (32b). The heat exchanger (1) includes partitions (33,34) provided at the lower front and rear tanks (32a,b), respectively, and a communication path (36) communicating between the same side ends of the lower front and rear tanks (32a,b). A communication header (38) forming the communication path (36) is formed integrally with the outermost heat transfer tube (2b). Liquid refrigerant flows at a greater amount through the central portion of the heat exchanger core (1a), whereas high temperature refrigerant flows through the edge portions of the heat exchanger core (1a). A uniform temperature distribution of air having passed through the heat exchanger (1) may be achieved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/0333 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H0712778 U 19950303

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995961 A2 20000426; EP 0995961 A3 20000726; EP 0995961 B1 20030910; DE 69911139 D1 20031016; DE 69911139 T2 20040401

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SANDEN HOLDINGS CORPORATION, JP

- Effective date: 20160525

2016-04-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SANDEN HOLDINGS CORPORATION, LSESAKI-SHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SANDEN CORP., ISESAKI, GUNMA, JP

- Document: DE 69911139

2016-04-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69911139

- Representative's name: PRUEFER & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANW, DE

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031210

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031221

2003-12-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911139 P 20031016

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030910

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020903

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI