Global Patent Index - EP 0995964 A2

EP 0995964 A2 2000-04-26 - Device for axially moving a gun barrel

Title (en)

Device for axially moving a gun barrel

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum längsaxialen Bewegen eines Waffenrohres

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour déplaçer axialement un tube de canon

Publication

EP 0995964 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113995 A

Priority

DE 19848355 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a hydraulic piston cylinder (7) connected to a pressure generating device (9). The piston cylinder is built into a cradle (1) forming a barrel mounting with the piston rod (7.1) engaging the cradle on one side and the base part (8) of the barrel (11) on the other side. The barrel is displaced against the pressure in a counter recoil mechanism.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum längsaxialen Bewegen eines Waffenrohres. Bekannte Vorrichtungen werden in ein an einer Waffenanlage vorhandenes Hydrauliksystem zwischen einem Rohrvorholer und einer Rohrbremse eingebunden. Oftmals führt das zu einem großen Anlagenaufwand und zu komplizierten Systemeinbindungen, beispielsweise durch notwendige Entlüftungen. Demgegenüber sieht die Lösung vor, eine Vorrichtung, die aus einem hydraulischen Kolbenzylinder (7) und einer druckerzeugenden Einrichtung (9) besteht, in einen Wiegenkörper (1) der Waffenanlage zu integrieren, wobei die Vorrichtung nicht in das vorhandene Hydrauliksystem eingebunden wird. Dabei greift eine Kolbenstange (7.1) des Kolbenzylinders (7)einerseits an den Wiegenkörper (1)an und andererseits an ein im Wiegenkörper (1) angebrachtes Bodenstück (8), an dem das Waffenrohr (11) befestigt ist. Durch die druckerzeugende Einrichtung (9) wird eine Kraft erzeugt, die entgegen einem Druck im Rohrvorholer das Waffenrohr (11) in die gewünschte Versteilposition (a) bringt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 25/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 25/02 (2006.01); F41A 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 31/00 (2013.01); F41A 25/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995964 A2 20000426; EP 0995964 A3 20010627; DE 19848355 A1 20000427

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-30 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020911

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010522

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 41A 25/02 A, 7F 41A 25/16 B

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI