Global patent index - EP 0995997 A1

EP 0995997 A1 2000-04-26 - APPARATUS FOR DETECTING TROUBLE WITH SOLENOID-OPERATED DEVICE

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR DETECTING TROUBLE WITH SOLENOID-OPERATED DEVICE

Title (de)

FEHLERERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINES ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN GESTEVERTEN ANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DETECTER LES DEFAILLANCES D'UN DISPOSITIF A SOLENOIDE

Publication

EP 0995997 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99910824 A

Priority

  • JP 9901753 W
  • JP 11821998 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for determining faults of an electromagnetic coil actuator that includes two current paths having of two pairs of series switches(10,20,30,40) and an electromagnetic coil(1) connected between the intermediates nodes(2,4) of the pairs. The existence of faults of an electromagnetic coil actuator is decided based both on the state of operation of the switch pair and on the magnitude of the voltage signal corresponding to the sum of a first voltage signal(VP) and a second voltage signal(VN) corresponding, respectively, to potentials at the intermediate nodes(2,4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 31/02; G01R 31/06; H01F 7/18; H01F 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 31/00 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/1844 (2013.01); H01F 7/1872 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995997 A1 20000426; EP 0995997 A4 20040721; JP H11311651 A 19991109; WO 9956139 A1 19991104

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050105

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-07-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01R 31/02 A

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01F 7/20 B

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01R 31/06 B

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01F 7/18 B

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL