Global Patent Index - EP 0996076 A1

EP 0996076 A1 2000-04-26 - Device for conversion between two systems of units, namely currency units, fountain pen and rule provided with this device

Title (en)

Device for conversion between two systems of units, namely currency units, fountain pen and rule provided with this device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Umrechnung zwischen zwei Einheitssystemen, nämlich Währungseinheiten, mit dieser Vorrichtung versehener Füllhalter und versehenes Lineal

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conversion entre deux systèmes d'unités, notamment d'unités monétaires, stylographe et réglette pourvus de ce dispositif

Publication

EP 0996076 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402612 A

Priority

FR 9813336 A

Abstract (en)

Device comprises a support cylinder with two scales (GE), (GF) corresponding to two systems of units positioned relative to each other on the support. Conversions between the two can be carried out using a cursor bar (2) that moves (T) freely along the support cylinder (10). The cursor comprises first and second transparent parts (TE, TF) separated by first and second masking parts (ME, MF). Calculations are made by rotating the cursor bar in such a way that the opaque masking parts covers the decimal figures of the conversion value and similarly the number of decimal figures for the value converted.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif de conversion (1) comprenant un cylindre support (10) comportant sur sa surface extérieure un premier ensemble de graduations (GE) selon un premier système d'unités et un second ensemble de graduations (GF) selon une second système d'unités, positionnés l'un par rapport à l'autre pour fournir des informations de conversion entre les premier et second systèmes d'unités, et une bague (2) faisant fonction de curseur, pouvant être déplacée librement en translation (T) le long du cylindre support (10). La bague curseur (2) comprend une première et une seconde parties translucides de visualisation (TE, TF) séparées par une première et une seconde parties de masquage (ME, MF). Elle peut être tournée dans un nombre prédéterminé de positions angulaires, de façon à pouvoir masquer simultanément un nombre souhaité de chiffres de décade d'une valeur à convertir et le même nombre de chiffres de décade de la valeur convertie. Utilisation notamment pour des convertisseurs Francs-Euros <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06G 1/00; G06G 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06G 1/00 (2006.01); G06G 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06G 1/085 (2013.01); G06G 1/0073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0996076 A1 20000426; FR 2785067 A1 20000428; FR 2785067 B1 20011228

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020122

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001023

2000-09-20 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI