Global Patent Index - EP 0996095 A1

EP 0996095 A1 2000-04-26 - Electronic usage control system

Title (en)

Electronic usage control system

Title (de)

Elektronische Benutzungskontrollvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Système électronique pour le contrôle de l'utilisation

Publication

EP 0996095 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112667 A

Priority

DE 19839003 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19839003A1] The access control unit has two readers (4,5), one behind the other, to read and to store data in information carrier, a disc shaped token (6). The information is read and evaluated and the tokens are directed either to a cassette (15) or to a return point (10). This action is provided by a controlled branch mechanism (7,12,8,13).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kassiervorrichtung einer elektronischen Benutzungskontrollvorrichtung mit einem Einsteckschlitz (1) zum Einstecken von Wert- und Informationsträgern (6), welchem Einsteckschlitz (1) eine Leseeinrichtung zum Erfassen des Informationsgehaltes von Wert- und/oder Informationsträger umfaßt und welcher Leseeinrichtung eine Kassette (15) nachgeordnet ist, wobei die Leseeinrichtung zwei hintereinanderliegende Lesestationen (4, 5) ausbildet, von denen die eine die in dem Informationsträger (6) und die andere die im Wertträger (6) gespeicherte Information ausliest und der Leseeinrichtung eine Weiche (7, 12, 8, 13) nachgeordnet ist, die je nach Weichenstellung den die Leseeinrichtung (4, 5) verlassenden Informationsträger (6) entweder in die Kassette (15) oder in eine Ausgabeöffnung (9) leitet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 15/04; G07B 15/00; G07D 5/00; G07F 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 1/06 (2006.01); G07F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/0866 (2013.01); G07F 1/06 (2013.01); G07F 7/0873 (2013.01); G07F 7/0893 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19839003 A1 20000302; EP 0996095 A1 20000426

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040202

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020219

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI