Global Patent Index - EP 0996096 A2

EP 0996096 A2 2000-04-26 - Method for improving the security of franking machines during the credit transfer and device for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for improving the security of franking machines during the credit transfer and device for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verbesserung der Sicherheit von Frankiermaschinen bei der Guthabenübertragung und Anordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour améliorer la sécurité de machines à affranchir pendant le transfert du crédit et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 0996096 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250032 A

Priority

  • DE 4446667 A
  • EP 95250286 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves establishing a first communications link between an authorized user and a data center, storing a code for a message announcing an authorized transaction for a subsequently transmitted pre-set request; switching on the franking machine to perform a predefined process to enter a special mode for a negative remote value pre-set; establishing a second communications connection between the franking machine and the data center and entering a pre-set request. A first transaction is performed after the machine enters communications mode to set a pre-set request according to a residual credit value to be transferred if the command process corresponding to a permitted process, as opposed to an unauthorized operation. The method further involves transferring and storing the security-relevant data or clearing a security flag for an impermissible deviation from the command process and disabling the franking machine. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Verbesserung der Sicherheit von Frankiermaschinen bei der Guthabenübertragung, mit mindestens zwei Modi. Im Ergebnis des Überwachens einer autorisierten Handlung an der Frankiermaschine, wird in einem Schritt (209) der Systemroutine (200) ein Sicherheits-Flag X gelöscht und bei seinem Fehlen die Frankiermaschine in einen ersten Modus überführt (Schritt 409), um sie damit wirksam außer Betrieb zu setzen. Anderenfalls wird in einem Sondermodus negative Fernwertvorgabe durch Setzen eines Sonder-Flags N eingetreten, wenn die vorbestimmte Bedienhandlung zum Seiteneinstieg in den Sondermodus beim Einschalten vorgenommen wird. Die Kommunikation (300) mit der Datenzentrale läuft unter zeitlicher und zustandsmäßiger (Flags) Überwachung durch die Steuereinheit der Frankiermaschine bis zur Vollendung der Transaktion ab. Von der Datenzentrale wird das Verhalten des Frankiermaschinenbenutzers auf der Basis von während der Kommunikation übermittelten Daten überwacht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00362 (2013.01); G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00161 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00241 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00258 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00419 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0079 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0717379 A2 19960619; EP 0717379 A3 19980415; EP 0717379 B1 20001025; DE 4446667 A1 19960620; DE 4446667 C2 19980917; DE 59511045 D1 20060608; DE 59511048 D1 20060614; EP 0996096 A2 20000426; EP 0996096 A3 20040616; EP 0996096 B1 20060510; EP 0996097 A2 20000426; EP 0996097 A3 20040616; EP 0996097 B1 20060503

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131121

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-09-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59511048

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131121

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131121

2014-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120908

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-04-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070213

2006-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59511048

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-06-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2006-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-05-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0717379

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2006-05-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-09-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA BETEILIGUNGS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-03-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

LT LV SI

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 717379

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT;LV;SI