Global Patent Index - EP 0996097 A2

EP 0996097 A2 2000-04-26 - Method for improving the security of franking machines during the credit transfer

Title (en)

Method for improving the security of franking machines during the credit transfer

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verbesserung der Sicherheit von Frankiermaschinen bei der Guthabenübertragung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour améliorer la sécurité de machines à affranchir pendant le transfert du crédit

Publication

EP 0996097 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250033 A

Priority

  • DE 4446667 A
  • EP 95250286 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0717379A2] The fraud prevention system prevents manipulation of the recorded postal charges during transmission of the latter to a remote data centre, using a control device with a microprocessor which verifies the authorisation of the user via a number of given criteria and monitors the data communication between the machine and the data centre. Pref. a specific key combination for each franking machine is stored at the data centre, which is only known to an authorised person, used for verification of the user before a refund chip card is acceptable.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Verbesserung der Sicherheit von Frankiermaschinen bei der Guthabenübertragung, mit mindestens zwei Modi. Im Ergebnis des Überwachens einer autorisierten Handlung an der Frankiermaschine, wird in einem Schritt (209) der Systemroutine (200) ein. Sicherheits-Flag X gelöscht und bei seinem Fehlen die Frankiermaschine in einen ersten Modus überführt (Schritt 409), um sie damit wirksam außer Betrieb zu setzen. Anderenfalls wird in einem Sondermodus negative Fernwertvorgabe durch Setzen eines Sonder-Flags N eingetreten, wenn die vorbestimmte Bedienhandlung zum Seiteneinstieg in den Sondermodus beim Einschalten vorgenommen wird. Die Kommunikation (300) mit der Datenzentrale läuft unter zeitlicher und zustandsmäßiger (Flags) Überwachung durch die Steuereinheit der Frankiermaschine bis zur Vollendung der Transaktion ab. Von der Datenzentrale wird das Verhalten des Frankiermaschinenbenutzers auf der Basis von während der Kommunikation übermittelten Daten überwacht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00362 (2013.01); G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00161 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00241 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00258 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00419 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0079 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0717379 A2 19960619; EP 0717379 A3 19980415; EP 0717379 B1 20001025; DE 4446667 A1 19960620; DE 4446667 C2 19980917; DE 59511045 D1 20060608; DE 59511048 D1 20060614; EP 0996096 A2 20000426; EP 0996096 A3 20040616; EP 0996096 B1 20060510; EP 0996097 A2 20000426; EP 0996097 A3 20040616; EP 0996097 B1 20060503

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101121

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101121

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59511045

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59511045

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101121

2011-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091124

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090916

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2006-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59511045 P 20060608

2006-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2006-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0717379 P

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2006-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-03-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LT LV SI

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2000-04-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 717379

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;LV;SI