Global Patent Index - EP 0996098 A2

EP 0996098 A2 2000-04-26 - Coin testing apparatus and method

Title (en)

Coin testing apparatus and method

Title (de)

Münzprüfvorrichtung und -verfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour la vérification de pièces de monnaie

Publication

EP 0996098 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99204271 A

Priority

  • EP 97918315 A
  • GB 9610603 A

Abstract (en)

A method of coin testing is provided in which a laser beam (13) is directed onto a face of a coin (4) and a laser detector (3) is used to detect where the laser beam is intercepted by the coin and where the laser beam is not intercepted by the coin, so as to obtain an indication of a characteristic of the face of the coin. The characteristic of the coin is used to identify the coin. The invention also relates to an apparatus for coin testing, which comprises a laser source (11) to direct a laser beam (13) onto a face of a coin (4), a laser detector (3) for detecting where the laser is intercepted by the coin and where the laser is not intercepted by the coin, and a signal-processor (14) which obtains an indication, from an output of the laser detector (3), of a characteristic of the face of the coin which is used to identify the coin. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 5/02; G07D 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/00 (2006.01); G07D 5/02 (2006.01); G07D 5/10 (2006.01); G07F 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/02 (2013.01); G07D 5/005 (2013.01); G07D 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9744760 A1 19971127; AR 008601 A1 20000209; AT 196378 T 20000915; AU 2648497 A 19971209; AU 716057 B2 20000217; BR 9709010 A 20000104; BR 9709010 B1 20081118; CA 2255642 A1 19971127; CA 2255642 C 20080401; CN 1135503 C 20040121; CN 1220750 A 19990623; DE 69703103 D1 20001019; DE 69703103 T2 20010118; EP 0900431 A1 19990310; EP 0900431 B1 20000913; EP 0996098 A2 20000426; EP 0996098 A3 20020731; ES 2150766 T3 20001201; GB 2327136 A 19990113; GB 9610603 D0 19960731; GB 9819877 D0 19981104; HK 1018919 A1 20011116; JP 2000510979 A 20000822; NZ 331979 A 20000825; SA 1218 B1 20060905; TW 352426 B 19990211; ZA 9704389 B 19990315

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080827

2007-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIGITALL INC.

2007-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PANZERI, EZIO

2007-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AL-HASHEMI, BURHAN

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-04-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

2002-07-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07D 5/02 A, 7G 07F 5/10 B

2000-04-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 900431

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI