Global Patent Index - EP 0996099 A2

EP 0996099 A2 2000-04-26 - Electroluminescent semiconductor for testing luminescent security features

Title (en)

Electroluminescent semiconductor for testing luminescent security features

Title (de)

Elektrolumineszierendes Halbleiterfestkörperelement als Prüfmittel für lumineszierende Sicherheitsmerkmale

Title (fr)

Elément semi-conducteur électroluminescent pour le test de caractéristiques de sécurité luminescentes

Publication

EP 0996099 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120299 A

Priority

DE 19848858 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has ultraviolet and/or infrared electro-luminescent semiconducting solid state elements e.g. light emitting diodes (2,3) and, optionally, a light element (4) whose radiation lies in the visible band. The elements are mounted together in a housing (5) to produce a focused light beam containing both visible and non-visible components. A spring-loaded push button is operated to activate the combination of elements. An Independent claim is also included for a method of monitoring luminescent security characteristics.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Verifikation von lumineszierenden Sicherheitsmerkmalen anhand von UV- und Infrarotlicht abstrahlenden Lumineszenzdioden (LED's). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/10 (2006.01); G07D 7/121 (2016.01); H01L 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/121 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0996099 A2 20000426; EP 0996099 A3 20020306; EP 0996099 B1 20060712; AT 333130 T 20060815; DE 59913658 D1 20060824; ES 2268822 T3 20070316; JP 2000322621 A 20001124

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061012

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061013

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061012

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BUNDESDRUCKEREI G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070413

2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029003

2007-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2268822 T3

2007-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-12-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061212

2006-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061110

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-10-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061012

2006-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913658 P 20060824

2006-08-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-07-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2006-07-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2006-07-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2006-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAPPE, FRANK

2006-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AHLERS, BENEDIKT DR.

2006-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUTMANN, ROLAND DR.

2006-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRANZ-BURGHOLZ, ARNIM

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050407

2004-10-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI