Global Patent Index - EP 0996106 A1

EP 0996106 A1 2000-04-26 - Panels of labelblanks of insertable labels for laser printing

Title (en)

Panels of labelblanks of insertable labels for laser printing

Title (de)

Stecketikettzuschnittenbogen für Laserdruck

Title (fr)

Planches d'ébauches d'étiquettes enfichables pour impression laser

Publication

EP 0996106 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402588 A

Priority

FR 9813254 A

Abstract (en)

The plant labels are laid out on a sheet that can be inserted in a laser printer, and are attached to each other along lines of weakness (6,7,8) so that they can be detached individually after printing. The labels have a pointed end, and they are assembled on the sheet as two rows of labels with the points (2G,2D) in the center of the sheet. The points are interleaved to form a continuous sheet.

Abstract (fr)

Les étiquettes ont chacune un corps (1) adapté à servir de support d'identification et un pied (2G,2D) d'enfichage pourvu de perforations formant ligne de pliage (12) selon la direction prévue pour l'enfichage. Elles sont obtenues à partir d'un flan de matériau ayant une épaisseur d'au moins 150 µm et convenant à l'impression laser, dans lequel des ébauches d'étiquettes sont disposées tête-bêche et en quinconce, avec les pieds (2G,2D) respectifs imbriqués les uns dans les autres, les futurs bords (6) des corps (1) étant matérialisés par des lignes de perforations pour rupture, les contours (7) des futurs pieds (2G,2D) étant matérialisés par des lignes de coupe franche avec préservation d'au moins un point d'attache (8) et les lignes de pliage (12) étant matérialisées par des lignes de perforations pour pliage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/206 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0996106 A1 20000426; EP 0996106 B1 20050126; DE 69923404 D1 20050303; DE 69923404 T2 20060105; FR 2785075 A1 20000428; FR 2785075 B1 20030103

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111020

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69923404

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111020

2012-05-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PRINTACK S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101109

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-06-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050517

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69923404 P 20050303

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PANELS OF LABELBLANKS OF INSERTABLE LABELS FOR LASER PRINTING

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE GB NL

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI