Global Patent Index - EP 0996133 A2

EP 0996133 A2 2000-04-26 - Elongated insulating element

Title (en)

Elongated insulating element

Title (de)

Langgestreckter Isolierkörper

Title (fr)

Corps isolant allongé

Publication

EP 0996133 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116943 A

Priority

DE 19839388 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19839388A1] The insulation, for an electrical conductor is a longitudinal hollow body (10') of at least two layers. The inner layer (11') is conductive and the outer layer (12) is an insulator. Both layers are of crosslinked thermoplastic materials. The inner conductive layer (11') has a mechanical reinforcement (7) as a woven or braided or knitted material of metal, glass fibers or plastics such as metal-coated plastics fibers.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Isolierhohlkörper mit einheitlich kontinuierlichem Querschnitt mit mindestens zweischichtigem Aufbau für elektrische Anwendungen in Mittel- oder Hochspannungsanlagen. Der vorgeschlagene Isolierhohlkörper 10' hat einen kreisrunden Querschnitt, eine Gesamtwanddicke W und eine lichte Weite D. Er besteht im wesentlichen aus einem vernetzten, thermoplastischen Isolierwerkstoff 12 mit einer inneren 11' und einer äußeren Leitschicht 13. Die innere Leitschicht 11' des Isolierhohlkörpers ist mit einer integrierten Verstärkungsschicht 7 versehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 3/44; H01B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 3/44 (2006.01); H01B 17/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/64 (2013.01); H01B 3/441 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29914999 U1 20000105; DE 19839388 A1 20000309; EP 0996133 A2 20000426; EP 0996133 A3 20010228; NO 994176 A 20000229; NO 994176 D0 19990827

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010829

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI