Global Patent Index - EP 0996135 A2

EP 0996135 A2 2000-04-26 - Driving device for the movable contact of an electrical switch

Title (en)

Driving device for the movable contact of an electrical switch

Title (de)

Antrieb für das bewegliche Kontaktstück eines elektrischen Schaltgerätes

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande pour le contact mobile d'un interrupteur électrique

Publication

EP 0996135 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119946 A

Priority

DE 19848551 A

Abstract (en)

The drive has a fixed part and a movable part connected to the movable contact part. The fixed part is a cylindrical tube (12) with coils (16a,16b,17a,17b,18a,18b) on its inside for producing a travelling magnetic field that drives a movable armature (20) within the tube. The armature has at least one permanent magnet whose North and South poles face alternately inwards and outwards.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Antrieb für das bewegliche Kontaktstück eines elektrischen Schaltgerätes, z. B. eines Hochspannungsleistungsschalters, insbesondere eines SF6-Leistungsschalters, eines Lasttrennschalters oder dgl., mit einem feststehenden Teil und einem mit dem beweglichen Kontaktstück verbundenen bewegbaren Teil. Dabei soll das feststehende Teil des Antriebes (12) ein zylindrisches Rohr sein, an dessen Innenseiten Spulen (16, 17, 18) zur Erzeugung eines Wanderfeldes angeordnet sind, wogegen das feststehende Teil als innerhalb des Rohres (12) und innerhalb der Spulen (16, 17, 18) gleitender Anker (20) ausgebildet ist, der von dem Wanderfeld angetrieben wird zur Betätigung des beweglichen Kontaktstückes eines Schaltgerätes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/42; H01H 33/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/28 (2006.01); H01H 33/38 (2006.01); H01H 33/42 (2006.01); H01H 33/666 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/6662 (2013.01); H01H 33/42 (2013.01); H01H 2003/268 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0996135 A2 20000426; EP 0996135 A3 20010829; DE 19848551 A1 20000427; JP 2000133096 A 20000512

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011010

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB T&D TECHNOLOGY LTD.

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI